Global patent index - EP 0969817 A1

EP 0969817 A1 2000-01-12 - DOSAGE FORMS HAVING IMPROVED RELEASE PROPERTIES

Title (en)

DOSAGE FORMS HAVING IMPROVED RELEASE PROPERTIES

Title (de)

DARREICHUNGSFORMEN MIT VERBESSERTEN FREISETZUNGSEIGENSCHAFTEN

Title (fr)

FORMES GALENIQUES AUX PROPRIETES DE LIBERATION AMELIOREES

Publication

EP 0969817 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98946129 A

Priority

  • US 9819735 W
  • US 94606597 A
  • US 14478498 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9917743A1] The invention relates to tablets made by directly compressing a composition containing binary active agent/solubilizer microspheres. The microspheres are made via liquiflash processing.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 9/16; A61K 47/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 9/16 (2006.01); A61K 31/366 (2006.01); A61K 45/08 (2006.01); A61K 47/34 (2006.01); A61P 3/06 (2006.01); A61P 25/04 (2006.01); A61P 25/06 (2006.01); A61P 29/00 (2006.01); A61P 37/08 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); A61K 9/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 9/1641 (2013.01); A61K 9/1694 (2013.01); A61K 9/146 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9917743A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9917743 A1 19990415; AU 9321198 A 19990427; CA 2273274 A1 19990415; EP 0969817 A1 20000112; JP 2002528042 A 20020827

INPADOC legal status

2003-07-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021228

2002-07-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020614

2000-09-06 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL SE

2000-07-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HERMAN, MARK, R.

2000-07-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MYERS, MICHAEL

2000-07-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SANGHVI, PRADEEPKUMAR, P.

2000-06-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: BIOVAIL TECHNOLOGIES LTD.

2000-01-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990527

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL SE