Global patent index - EP 0969857 A1

EP 0969857 A1 2000-01-12 - PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS

Title (en)

PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS

Title (de)

PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN

Title (fr)

COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES

Publication

EP 0969857 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98912470 A

Priority

  • EP 9801432 W
  • KR 19970008750 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: GB2337703A] The present invention relates to a cyclosporin-containing soft capsule preparation which comprises a composition containing cyclosporin as an active ingredient; a hydrophilic component polyethylene glycol or a non-hydrophilic component propylene carbonate or their mixture, one or a mixture of two or more selected from the group consisting of an esterified compound of fatty acid and primary alcohol, medium chain fatty acid triglyceride and fatty acid monoglyceride as an oil component; and a surfactant having an HLB (Hydrophilic Lipophilic Balance) value of 8 to 17.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 38/13

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 9/107 (2006.01); A61K 9/48 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 38/13 (2006.01); A61K 47/08 (2006.01); A61K 47/10 (2006.01); A61K 47/14 (2006.01); A61K 47/22 (2006.01); A61P 37/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 38/13 (2013.01); A61K 9/1075 (2013.01); A61K 9/4858 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

GB 2337703 A 19991201; GB 9921495 D0 19991117; AR 012054 A1 20000927; AU 6729398 A 19981012; AU 741923 B2 20011213; BR 9808324 A 20000516; CA 2283901 A1 19980924; CN 1161150 C 20040811; CN 1250378 A 20000412; CO 4940404 A1 20000724; CZ 9903243 A3 19991215; DE 19882184 T1 20000210; EP 0969857 A1 20000112; HU 0001515 A2 20000928; HU 0001515 A3 20001030; ID 23531 A 20000427; IL 131703 D0 20010319; JP 2000514831 A 20001107; JP 3748573 B2 20060222; KR 20000075940 A 20001226; MY 118614 A 20041231; NO 994436 A 19990913; NO 994436 D0 19990913; PE 59499 A1 19990705; PL 335729 A1 20000508; RU 2185188 C2 20020720; SK 123299 A3 20000214; TR 9902229 T2 19991221; WO 9841225 A1 19980924; ZA 9802117 B 19980914

INPADOC legal status

2006-10-20 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Country Code: HK

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1026611

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2001-10-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010417

2001-08-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOVARTIS AG

2000-09-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000804

2000-01-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990901

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: RO PAYMENT 19990901;SI PAYMENT 19990901