Global patent index - EP 0969869 A2

EP 0969869 A2 2000-01-12 - COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING AN INDUCING AGENT AND AN ANTI-VIRAL AGENT FOR THE TREATMENT OF BLOOD, VIRAL AND CELLULAR DISORDERS

Title (en)

COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING AN INDUCING AGENT AND AN ANTI-VIRAL AGENT FOR THE TREATMENT OF BLOOD, VIRAL AND CELLULAR DISORDERS

Title (de)

ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ENTHALTEND EINEN INDUZIERENDEN WIKSTOFF UND EINEN ANTIVIRALEN WIRKSTOFF ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON VIRALEN UND ZELLULÄREN STÖRUNGEN

Title (fr)

COMPOSITIONS CONTENANT UN AGENT INDUCTEUR AINSI QU'UN AGENT ANTIVIRAL ET DESTINEES AU TRAITEMENT DE TROUBLES CELLULAIRES, SANGUINS ET VIRAUX

Publication

EP 0969869 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 97936153 A

Priority

  • US 9712818 W
  • US 68767096 A
  • US 68767196 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9804290A2] The invention relates to novel compositions and to novel methods for the administration of compositions to a patient or to cells in vitro for the treatment of human disorders. In one embodiment, compositions contain chemical compounds that stimulate the expression of fetal hemoglobin and/or stimulate the proliferation of red blood cells, white blood cells and platelets in patients and ex vivo for reconstitution of hematopoiesis in vivo. These methods are useful to treat or prevent the symptoms associated with anemia, sickle cell disease, thalassemia and other blood disorders. In another embodiment, compositions contain an inducing agent and an anti-viral agent. The inducing agent induces the expression of a cellular or viral product, such as viral thymidine kinase, increasing the sensitivity of proliferating cells to the anti-viral agent. Typical anti-viral agents include nucleoside analogs such as ganciclovir that inhibit viral replication. Methods involve administration of therapeutically effective amounts of the inducing agent with the anti-viral agent to destroy virus-infected cells. Viral infections that can be treated include infections by herpes viruses such as Kaposi's-associated herpes virus and Epstein-Barr virus, HIV infections and HTLV infections. These compositions and methods are particularly effective against episomal and latent infections in proliferating cells. The invention also relates to novel methods for the pulsed administration of compositions to patients for the treatment and prevention of cell proliferative disorders including deficiencies such as cytopenia and malignancies such as viral-induced tumors, other forms of neoplasia and for expansion of cells for hematopoietic transplantation. 00000

[origin: WO9804290A2] The invention relates to novel compositions and to novel methods for the administration of compositions to a patient or to cells in vitro for the treatment of human disorders. In one embodiment, compositions contain chemical compounds that stimulate the expression of fetal hemoglobin and/or stimulate the proliferation of red blood cells, white blood cells and platelets in patients and ex vivo for reconstitution of hematopoiesis in vivo. These methods are useful to treat or prevent the symptoms associated with anemia, sickle cell disease, thalassemia and other blood disorders. In another embodiment, compositions contain an inducing agent and an anti-viral agent. The inducing agent induces the expression of a cellular or viral product, such as viral thymidine kinase, increasing the sensitivity of proliferating cells to the anti-viral agent. Typical anti-viral agents include nucleoside analogs such as ganciclovir that inhibit viral replication. Methods involve administration of therapeutically effective amounts of the inducing agent with the anti-viral agent to destroy virus-infected cells. Viral infections that can be treated include infections by herpes viruses such as Kaposi's-associated herpes virus and Epstein-Barr virus, HIV infections and HTLV infections. These compositions and methods are particularly effective against episomal and latent infections in proliferating cells. The invention also relates to novel methods for the pulsed administration of compositions to patients for the treatment and prevention of cell proliferative disorders including deficiencies such as cytopenia and malignancies such as viral-induced tumors, other forms of neoplasia and for expansion of cells for hematopoietic transplantation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 45/06; A61K 31/19; A61K 31/195; A61K 31/52; A61K 31/70

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/19 (2006.01); A61K 31/195 (2006.01); A61K 31/22 (2006.01); A61K 38/21 (2006.01); A61K 38/55 (2006.01); A61K 45/06 (2006.01); A61P 31/12 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/19 (2013.01); A61K 31/195 (2013.01); A61K 45/06 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. A61K 31/19 + A61K 2300/00
  2. A61K 31/195 + A61K 2300/00

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9804290A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE FR GB GR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9804290 A2 19980205; WO 9804290 A3 19980813; AU 3889197 A 19980220; CA 2263675 A1 19980205; CA 2263675 C 20100413; EP 0969869 A2 20000112; EP 1611885 A1 20060104; EP 1611885 A8 20071024; EP 1886677 A1 20080213; EP 2298350 A2 20110323; EP 2298350 A3 20110608; JP 2001527517 A 20011225

INPADOC legal status

2013-02-22 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1084335

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2006-07-28 [REG HK DE] REQUESTS TO DESIGNATE PATENT IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: DE

- Ref Document Number: 1084335

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2005-12-21 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20050731

2001-10-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010831

2000-01-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990226

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB GR IT LI