Global patent index - EP 0969932 A1

EP 0969932 A1 2000-01-12 - CRUSHING MACHINE HOUSING

Title (en)

CRUSHING MACHINE HOUSING

Title (de)

GEHÄUSE FÜR EINE ZERKLEINERUNGSMASCHINE

Title (fr)

CARTER POUR MACHINE A BROYER

Publication

EP 0969932 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98924038 A

Priority

  • DE 9800863 W
  • DE 19712587 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9842443A1] The invention relates to a housing for a crushing machine, comprising active abrading tools, i.e. a hammer, joined to a rotor which is accommodated in said housing, in addition to an anvil included in the housing as a counter tool, and inactive abrading members which are both secured to the rotor and lodged inside the housing. The invention also comprises an orifice for introducing the material that is to be crushed and at least one grid as an inactive abrading member, an ejection door for removing heavy pieces in addition to an impact wall segment lying opposite to said door as an inactive abrading member, and horizontally assembled housing components arranged on at least one plane, one of which can be pivoted outwards around at least one rotational point. At least parts of the abrading members (17, 18.1, 18.2, 19) are secured to the housing (1) by means of screws (31) on the respective abrading member (17, 18.1, 18.2, 19), and form distinct abrading areas in the crushing process in such a way that abrading members (18.1, 19) with increased wear resistant properties when compared to the other abrading members (18.2, 17) are arranged around the rotor (32) on the sidewalls (7, 11) of the housing (1). All of said features result in harmonious abrading qualities of both the housing (1) and the rotor (32) with regard to design, shaping, material composition and/or reciprocal allocation, thereby enabling approximately uniform maintenance intervals to be obtained.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B02C 13/282

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B02C 13/282 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B02C 13/282 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9842443A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9842443 A1 19981001; AT 226112 T 20021115; DE 19712587 A1 19981029; DE 19712587 C2 20011115; DK 0969932 T3 20021230; EP 0969932 A1 20000112; EP 0969932 B1 20021016; ES 2187027 T3 20030516; JP 2001518845 A 20011016; US 6371393 B1 20020416

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160316

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160314

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160317

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160329

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160317

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160315

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160317

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20160303

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-15 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59805972

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Owner name: METSO GERMANY GMBH, DE

- Free Format Text: FORMER OWNER: METSO LINDEMANN GMBH, 40231 DUESSELDORF, DE

2016-04-15 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59805972

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: HOFFMANN - EITLE PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE PA, DE

2016-03-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-06-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20150323

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-05-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20150225

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150323

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150325

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-05-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20150318

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150224

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150324

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20150305

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150225

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150325

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-04-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20150323

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-03-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PCAR

- Free Format Text: NEW ADDRESS: EIGERSTRASSE 2 POSTFACH, 3000 BERN 14 (CH)

2014-10-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59805972

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: HOFFMANN - EITLE PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE PA, DE

2014-10-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59805972

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: HOFFMANN - EITLE, DE

2003-10-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030717

2003-06-25 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

- Ref Document Number: 0969932E

- Country of Ref Document: IE

2003-06-13 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2003-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2187027

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-03-24 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030324

2003-03-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030213

2003-03-03 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: METSO LINDEMANN GMBH

2003-02-03 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: METSO LINDEMANN GMBH

2003-01-16 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030116

2003-01-02 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLICATION

- Owner name: METSO LINDEMANN GMBH

2002-12-30 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2002-12-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: KELLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2002-11-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59805972

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20021121

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2002-11-13 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2002-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-10-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2002-10-16 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021016

2002-10-16 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021016

2002-10-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 226112

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 20021115

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2002-10-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-04-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020312

2000-01-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990916

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI LU NL PT SE