Global Patent Index - EP 0969933 A1

EP 0969933 A1 2000-01-12 - DEVICE FOR SPRAYING A FLUID PRODUCT, SUCH AS A DOUBLE DOSE DISPENSER

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR SPRAYING A FLUID PRODUCT, SUCH AS A DOUBLE DOSE DISPENSER

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM ZERSTÄUBEN EINES FLUIDS, WIE Z.B. EINE ZWEI FLUIDDOSEN ZERSTÄUBENDE VORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE PULVERISATION DE PRODUIT FLUIDE, TEL QU'UN BIDOSE

Publication

EP 0969933 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98914922 A

Priority

  • FR 9800522 W
  • FR 9703703 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2761281A1] The invention concerns a device for spraying a fluid product comprising a reservoir (11) containing several doses of product, a cylindrical base (14) housing the reservoir (11), a dispensing member such as a pump, a manually actuated element (20), splitting means (16) co-operating with said actuating element (20) for splitting the contents of the reservoir (11) into at least two doses, and means for accumulating energy (12) co-operating, when the device is actuated, with said manual actuating element (20) for accumulating energy in the user's hand to ensure at each actuation a proper spraying of the entire dose of product. The invention is characterised in that said base (14), said splitting means (16) and said energy accumulating means (12) are integrated in a single-piece unit (10).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05B 11/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 11/00 (2006.01); B05B 11/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 11/02 (2013.01); B05B 11/025 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9842447A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2761281 A1 19981002; FR 2761281 B1 19990521; CN 1095697 C 20021211; CN 1251058 A 20000419; DE 69811644 D1 20030403; DE 69811644 T2 20040129; DE 69811644 T3 20080221; EP 0969933 A1 20000112; EP 0969933 B1 20030226; EP 0969933 B2 20070627; JP 2001520580 A 20011030; JP 4045557 B2 20080213; US 6257457 B1 20010710; WO 9842447 A1 19981001

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170324

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-03-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161001

2016-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69811644

2016-03-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-06-25 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69811644

- Representative's name: STAUDT IP LAW, DE

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150311

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140316

2015-03-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140316

2014-11-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140316

2013-09-19 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: APTAR FRANCE SAS, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: VALOIS S.A.S., LE NEUBOURG, FR

- Document: DE 69811644

- Effective date: 20130729

2013-09-19 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69811644

- Representative's name: BITTNER & PARTNER, DE

- Effective date: 20130729

2013-09-19 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69811644

- Representative's name: BITTNER & PARTNER, DE

- Effective date: 20130731

2013-09-19 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69811644

- Representative's name: BITTNER & PARTNER RECHTS- UND PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20130731

2013-09-19 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69811644

- Representative's name: BITTNER & PARTNER RECHTS- UND PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20130729

2013-09-19 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69811644

- Representative's name: STAUDT IP LAW, DE

- Effective date: 20130731

2013-09-19 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69811644

- Representative's name: STAUDT IP LAW, DE

- Effective date: 20130729

2013-07-31 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69811644

- Representative's name: BITTNER & PARTNER, DE

2013-07-29 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69811644

- Representative's name: BITTNER & PARTNER, DE

2013-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130315

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-02-08 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: APTAR FRANCE SAS, FR

- Effective date: 20130104

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120326

- Year of fee payment: 15

2007-08-29 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

2007-06-27 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20070627

2007-06-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-01-28 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: BECTON, DICKINSON AND COMPANY

- Effective date: 20031126

2003-06-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030512

2003-04-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69811644 P 20030403

2003-02-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-02-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-01-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VALOIS S.A.S.

2000-01-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991025

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT