Global Patent Index - EP 0969948 A1

EP 0969948 A1 2000-01-12 - SCREWING ELEMENT

Title (en)

SCREWING ELEMENT

Title (de)

SCHRAUBERELEMENT

Title (fr)

ELEMENT DE VISSAGE

Publication

EP 0969948 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98913550 A

Priority

  • DE 19712783 A
  • EP 9800871 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19712783A1] The invention concerns a screwing element (1) for receiving the fastener head (5) of a fastener device (6), which screwing element (1) is provided with jaws (3, 4) for grasping the fastener head. The jaws (3, 4) can be inserted into and extracted from the mounting (2) in the axial direction and, in the extracted position, can be pivoted apart from each other into an open position. At their free ends, the jaws have recesses (15, 16) with adjoining gripper-like parts (17, 18) which project towards the centre axis and engage behind the fastener head (5) in a form- and/or force-locking manner.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25B 13/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 23/10 (2006.01); B25B 13/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 13/44 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9842480A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19712783 A1 19981001; DE 19712783 C2 20001109; AT 246573 T 20030815; AU 6821398 A 19981020; AU 745719 B2 20020328; BR 9808420 A 20000523; CA 2283801 A1 19981001; CN 1111469 C 20030618; CN 1251064 A 20000419; CZ 289946 B6 20020417; CZ 9903181 A3 20000614; EA 001019 B1 20000828; EA 199900867 A1 20000424; EP 0969948 A1 20000112; EP 0969948 B1 20030806; HU 0001082 A2 20001228; HU 0001082 A3 20020228; ID 22453 A 19991014; IL 131989 D0 20010319; JP 2000510057 A 20000808; JP 3329832 B2 20020930; KR 100332253 B1 20020412; KR 20010005618 A 20010115; NO 310857 B1 20010910; NO 994668 A 19990924; NO 994668 D0 19990924; NZ 500450 A 20021220; PL 335442 A1 20000425; SK 111699 A3 20000516; TR 199902358 T2 20000621; US 2001025553 A1 20011004; US 6240811 B1 20010605; US 6539826 B2 20030401; WO 9842480 A1 19981001

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170216

2018-02-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170216

2018-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170901

2017-11-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170217

2017-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170228

2017-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170228

2017-10-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20170216

2017-10-03 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2017-09-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2017-09-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59809212

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170224

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-02-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: JOERG BAUR SFS INTEC AG INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY , CH

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160223

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160212

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160106

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160215

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-03-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: JOERG BAUR SFS INTEC AG INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY , CH

2016-02-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-01-27 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59809212

- Representative's name: SCHUMACHER & WILLSAU PATENTANWALTSGESELLSCHAFT, DE

2011-07-29 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20110616

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100216

2010-04-30 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20091201

2005-08-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: JUERG PLUESS SFS INTEC AG INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY MA

2005-02-16 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050216

2004-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SFS INTEC HOLDING A.G.

- Effective date: 20040228

2004-07-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040507

2004-05-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-03-24 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040228

2004-02-28 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040228

2004-02-16 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040216

2004-02-16 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040216

2004-01-26 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20030806

2004-01-06 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040106

2003-12-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031204

2003-12-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-11-18 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-11-17 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031117

2003-11-06 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031106

2003-11-06 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031106

2003-09-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59809212 P 20030911

2003-09-03 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-08-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ING. HANS LUDESCHER, PATENTABTEILUNG DER SFS GRUPP

2003-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-08-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-08-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-08-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-08-06 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030806

2003-08-06 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030806

2003-08-06 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030806

2002-01-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SFS INTEC HOLDING AG

2001-08-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010705

2000-01-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990814

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 19990814;LT PAYMENT 19990814;LV PAYMENT 19990814;MK PAYMENT 19990814;RO PAYMENT 19990814;SI PAYMENT 19990814