Global Patent Index - EP 0969968 A2

EP 0969968 A2 2000-01-12 - CYLINDER ARRANGEMENT FOR WEB-FED ROTARY PRINTING PRESS

Title (en)

CYLINDER ARRANGEMENT FOR WEB-FED ROTARY PRINTING PRESS

Title (de)

ZYLINDERANORDNUNG FÜR ROLLENROTATIONSDRUCKMASCHINEN

Title (fr)

CONFIGURATION DE CYLINDRE POUR PRESSES ROTATIVES A BOBINES

Publication

EP 0969968 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 98931918 A

Priority

  • DE 9801054 W
  • DE 19716283 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19716283A1] In a cylinder arrangement for a rotary printing press, the backlashes caused by traction of the drive gears must be compensated. This is achieved in that a cylinder able to compensate the backlash is fitted at a determinable rotation angle differential to the previous cylinder.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 13/008

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/00 (2006.01); B41F 13/012 (2006.01); B41F 13/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/012 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9847708A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19716283 A1 19981022; EP 0969968 A2 20000112; EP 0969968 B1 20020313; JP 2001506946 A 20010529; JP 3260387 B2 20020225; US 6263793 B1 20010724; WO 9847708 A2 19981029; WO 9847708 A3 19990128

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060502

2007-03-09 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20061230

2006-12-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20060414

2006-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2006-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060430

2006-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060430

2006-04-14 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060414

2005-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051101

2005-04-25 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050425

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-04-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050419

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-03-22 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050322

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-06-21 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040621

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-03-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20021216

2002-10-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020906

2002-09-25 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020925

2002-08-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-04-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59803333

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-04-18

2002-03-20 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: KOENIG & BAUER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2002-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-03-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2002-03-13 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020313

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-07-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010607

2000-01-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991103

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI