Global Patent Index - EP 0969969 B1

EP 0969969 B1 2001-04-11 - PRINTER FOR PRINTING ON SINGLE SHEETS AND AN ENDLESS PAPER STRIP

Title (en)

PRINTER FOR PRINTING ON SINGLE SHEETS AND AN ENDLESS PAPER STRIP

Title (de)

DRUCKER ZUM BEDRUCKEN VON EINZELBLÄTTERN UND ENDLOSPAPIERBAHNEN

Title (fr)

IMPRIMANTE SERVANT A IMPRIMER DES FEUILLES INDIVIDUELLES ET DES BANDES DE PAPIER SANS FIN

Publication

EP 0969969 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98906849 A

Priority

  • DE 9800245 W
  • DE 19709941 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19709941A1] The invention relates to a printer (10) for printing on single sheets (126, 128) and on at least one endless paper strip (122) on a printing support area (19). In said printer a single sheet (126, 128) is fed by manual displacement on a paper feed platform (20) from the operator side towards the printing station (36, 56), where it is able to cover the endless paper strip (122) at least along part of its width. The endless paper strip (122) is fed from the operator side to the printing station (36, 56). In addition, one driven intake roller (98; 38) each of a pair of intake rollers (100; 44) is assigned to the supply channel (34) for the endless paper strip and to the supply channel for the single sheets (30). A backing roll (42) mounted on an oscillating element (48) can be pressed against the driven intake roller (98; 38) of either the endless paper supply channel (34) or the single sheet supply channel (30).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 11/50; B41J 11/54; B41J 11/70

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 11/48 (2006.01); B41J 11/50 (2006.01); B41J 11/54 (2006.01); B41J 11/70 (2006.01); B41J 13/02 (2006.01); B41J 15/04 (2006.01); B65H 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 11/48 (2013.01); B41J 11/50 (2013.01); B41J 11/54 (2013.01); B41J 11/70 (2013.01); B41J 15/042 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19709941 A1 19980917; EP 0969969 A1 20000112; EP 0969969 B1 20010411; ES 2156030 T3 20010601; JP 2001514584 A 20010911; JP 4046772 B2 20080213; US 5988903 A 19991123; WO 9840219 A1 19980917

INPADOC legal status


2016-01-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110131

2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-10-23 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59800627

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-08-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59800627

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130123

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110128

2011-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110128

2011-10-14 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110930

2011-09-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110128

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100121

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100212

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100129

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090129

2010-03-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090129

2008-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080125

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-12-21 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2004-04-30 [REG FR D3] DECISION TO REVOKE THE DECISION OF LAPSE

2004-03-31 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2003-09-12 [REG FR RN] APPLICATION FOR RESTORATION

2002-10-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2002-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020930

2002-04-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010705

2001-07-03 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2001-06-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2156030 T3

2001-05-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59800627 20010517

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-10-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000905

2000-09-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: WINCOR NIXDORF GMBH & CO KG

2000-01-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990903

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT