Global patent index - EP 0969970 A1

EP 0969970 A1 2000-01-12 - COMPACT PRINTING MECHANISM

Title (en)

COMPACT PRINTING MECHANISM

Title (de)

KOMPAKTER DRUCKER

Title (fr)

MECANISME D'IMPRESSION COMPACT

Publication

EP 0969970 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98913884 A

Priority

  • FR 9800487 W
  • FR 9702861 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2760684A1] The invention concerns a printing mechanism designed for producing an ultra-compact mechanism. The thermal printing mechanism comprises a frame, a motor and a gear assembly driving a roller (7), a thermal printing head (8), a member pressing (9) the head (8) on the roller (7), characterised in that it comprises a member providing at least vertical rigidity (10) to two separate sides of the frame and at least rotational resistance along an axis substantially perpendicular to a third side of the frame, or, at least rotational resistance to two sides of the frame. The invention is useful for printing mechanisms of electronic payment terminals.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 29/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/32 (2006.01); B41J 29/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 29/02 (2013.01); B41J 2/32 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9840221A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2760684 A1 19980918; FR 2760684 B1 19990507; AT 206663 T 20011015; AU 6841698 A 19980929; DE 69801986 D1 20011115; DE 69801986 T2 20020627; DK 0969970 T3 20020211; EP 0969970 A1 20000112; EP 0969970 B1 20011010; ES 2166158 T3 20020401; PT 969970 E 20020328; US 6338584 B1 20020115; WO 9840221 A1 19980917

INPADOC legal status

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160106

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160106

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160302

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-01-06 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150220

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150223

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150320

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110312

2012-06-08 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

- Owner name: APS MANUFACTURING EOOD, BG

- Effective date: 20120504

2012-04-23 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20120423

2012-02-09 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69801986

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20111001

2012-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111001

2011-12-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110331

2011-11-02 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20111006 AND 20111012

2011-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *APS ENGINEERING S.A.R.L.

- Effective date: 20110331

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091209

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-06-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20091209

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20091231

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-10-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061002

2006-12-13 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2006-12-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061001

2006-11-21 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2006-10-31 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES;SEARCHED & EXAMINED PATENT

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

- Effective date: 20060911

2006-10-30 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2006-10-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061001

2006-09-11 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060911

2006-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-13 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060313

2006-03-12 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060312

2006-03-11 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060311

2006-03-11 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060311

2005-05-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20050530

- Year of fee payment: 08

2005-03-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20050331

- Year of fee payment: 08

2005-03-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20050331

- Year of fee payment: 08

2005-03-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20050330

- Year of fee payment: 08

2005-03-18 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20050318

- Year of fee payment: 08

2005-03-18 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20050318

- Year of fee payment: 08

2005-03-17 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20050317

- Year of fee payment: 08

2005-03-16 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20050316

- Year of fee payment: 08

2005-03-10 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20050310

- Year of fee payment: 08

2005-03-08 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20050308

- Year of fee payment: 08

2005-01-21 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20050121

- Year of fee payment: 08

2004-09-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: KIRKER & CIE SA

2002-10-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-24 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

- Ref Document Number: 20020400051

- Country of Ref Document: GR

2002-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2166158

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2002-03-28 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20020104

2002-02-11 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2002-02-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020114

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-11-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 69801986

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20011115

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2001-11-14 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: FRENCH

2001-10-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2001-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 206663

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 20011015

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-03-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000208

2000-02-02 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 19990910

2000-01-19 [D17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (DELETED)

2000-01-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990910

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE