Global Patent Index - EP 0970024 A1

EP 0970024 A1 2000-01-12 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A GLASS OBJECT HAVING AT LEAST ONE RECESS

Title (en)

METHOD FOR PRODUCING A GLASS OBJECT HAVING AT LEAST ONE RECESS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN EINES GLASKÖRPERS MIT MINDESTENS EINER AUSNEHMUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN OBJET EN VERRE COMPRENANT AU MOINS UN EVIDEMENT

Publication

EP 0970024 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98928055 A

Priority

  • DE 9800849 W
  • DE 19712779 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9842628A1] An etching mask (4) with at least one etching window (5) is applied on a glass object (1) consisting substantially of boron silicate glass. Subsequently, the glass object (1) is etched through the etching window (5) by using, for instance, HF, thereby producing trapezoidal trenches or truncated pyramidal grooves in its cross-section.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C03C 15/00; H01L 21/00; G02B 6/12; G02B 6/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C03C 15/00 (2006.01); G02B 6/36 (2006.01); G02B 6/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C03C 15/00 (2013.01); G02B 6/4244 (2013.01); G02B 6/4257 (2013.01); G02B 6/3692 (2013.01); G02B 6/4214 (2013.01); G02B 6/4245 (2013.01); G02B 6/4274 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9842628 A1 19981001; CN 1251565 A 20000426; EP 0970024 A1 20000112; EP 0970024 B1 20040804; US 6576150 B1 20030610

INPADOC legal status


2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091001

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080323

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-12-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20081125

2008-11-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20080323

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080430

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070319

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-08-24 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2007-07-18 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2007-03-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070327

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-07-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050506

2005-06-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-12-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20041129

2004-09-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59811760

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-09-09

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-08-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-08-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-11-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-09-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000801

2000-01-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990917

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB