Global Patent Index - EP 0970063 A1

EP 0970063 A1 2000-01-12 - PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF SUBSTITUTED THIAZOLIDINEDIONE

Title (en)

PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF SUBSTITUTED THIAZOLIDINEDIONE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON SUBSTITUIERTEN THIAZOLIDINEDIONEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE THIAZOLIOINEDIONE SUBSTITUEE

Publication

EP 0970063 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98908093 A

Priority

  • EP 9800818 W
  • GB 9703310 A
  • GB 9703338 A
  • GB 9703334 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9837073A1] A process for preparing a compound of formula (I, I) or a tautomeric form thereof or a pharmaceutically acceptable salt thereof or a pharmaceutically acceptable solvate thereof, wherein: J represents O or S; T represents a substituted or unsubstituted aryl group and T<1> is O or S; which process comprises reducing a compound of formula (II, II) or a tautomeric form thereof or a salt thereof or a solvate thereof, wherein T and T<1> are as defined in relation to formula (I), with a complex hydride reducing agent or a source of a complex hydride reducing agent; and thereafter, as required, preparing a pharmaceutically acceptable salt or a pharmaceutically acceptable solvate of the compound of formula (I) or a tautomeric form thereof.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 277/34; C07D 417/06; C07D 417/10; C07D 417/12; C07D 417/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07D 277/20 (2006.01); C07D 263/44 (2006.01); C07D 277/34 (2006.01); C07D 277/36 (2006.01); C07D 413/12 (2006.01); C07D 413/14 (2006.01); C07D 417/06 (2006.01); C07D 417/10 (2006.01); C07D 417/12 (2006.01); C07D 417/14 (2006.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

C07D (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 417/06 (2013.01); C07D 277/34 (2013.01); C07D 417/10 (2013.01); C07D 417/12 (2013.01); C07D 417/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9837073A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9837073 A1 19980827; AP 1359 A 20041202; AP 9901626 A0 19990930; AR 011447 A1 20000816; AU 6622398 A 19980909; BG 103735 A 20000630; BG 64311 B1 20040930; BR 9807395 A 20000314; CA 2281695 A1 19980827; CA 2281695 C 20061212; CN 1252065 A 20000503; CZ 296272 B6 20060215; CZ 9902924 A3 20000216; DZ 2430 A1 20030111; EA 199900754 A1 20000424; EP 0970063 A1 20000112; EP 1770092 A1 20070404; HU 0001459 A2 20001028; HU 0001459 A3 20021128; ID 22222 A 19990916; IL 131392 A 20050725; IL 131392 D0 20010128; IN 188379 B 20020914; JP 2001514619 A 20010911; JP 2009149616 A 20090709; KR 20000071138 A 20001125; MA 24475 A1 19981001; MY 129475 A 20070430; NO 20023937 A 19990907; NO 20023937 D0 20020819; NO 313290 B1 20020909; NO 993949 A 19990907; NO 993949 D0 19990817; NZ 337179 A 20010727; OA 11148 A 20030416; PE 71899 A1 19990915; PL 195482 B1 20070928; PL 335163 A1 20000410; SK 112099 A3 20000516; SK 285979 B6 20071206; SK 287512 B6 20101207; TR 9902019 T2 19991221; TW I222446 B 20041021; UY 24886 A1 20010827

INPADOC legal status


2007-09-21 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1025099

2006-08-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060215

2003-02-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030107

2002-09-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC

2000-01-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990817

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: RO PAYMENT 19990817;SI PAYMENT 19990817