Global Patent Index - EP 0970079 A1

EP 0970079 A1 2000-01-12 - FARNESYL TRANSFERASE INHIBITING 1,8-ANNELATED QUINOLINONE DERIVATIVES SUBSTITUTED WITH N- OR C-LINKED IMIDAZOLES

Title (en)

FARNESYL TRANSFERASE INHIBITING 1,8-ANNELATED QUINOLINONE DERIVATIVES SUBSTITUTED WITH N- OR C-LINKED IMIDAZOLES

Title (de)

MIT DURCH N- ODER C-VERBUNDENEN IMIDAZOLE SUBSTITUIERTEN FARNESYL-TRANSFERASE INHIBITORENDEN 1,8-ANNELLIERTEN CHINOLON-DERIVATE

Title (fr)

DERIVES DE QUINOLINONE 1,8-ANNELEE SUBSTITUES PAR DES IMIZADOLES LIES EN N OU EN C INHIBANT LA TRANSEFRASE FARNESYLE

Publication

EP 0970079 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98916890 A

Priority

  • EP 98916890 A
  • EP 97200708 A
  • EP 97200709 A
  • EP 9801296 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9840383A1] This invention concerns compounds of formula (I), the pharmaceutically acceptable acid additions salts and the stereochemically isomeric forms thereof, wherein the dotted line represents an optional bond; X is oxygen or sulfur; -A- is a bivalent radical of formula; R<1> and R<2> each independently are hydrogen, hydroxy, halo, cyano, C1-6alkyl, trihalomethyl, trihalomethoxy, C2-6alkenyl, C1-6alkyloxy, hydroxyC1-6alkyloxy, C1-6alkyloxyC1-6alkyloxy, C1-6alkyloxycarbonyl, aminoC1-6alkyloxy, mono- or di(C1-6alkyl)aminoC1-6alkyloxy, Ar, Ar-C1-6alkyl, Ar-oxy, Ar-C1-6alkyloxy; or when on adjacent positions R<1> and R<2> taken together may form a bivalent radical; R<3> and R<4> each independently are hydrogen, halo, cyano, C1-6alkyl, C1-6alkyloxy, Ar-oxy, C1-6alkylthio, di(C1-6alkyl)amino, trihalomethyl, trihalomethoxy; or when on adjacent positions R<3> and R<4> taken together may form a bivalent radical; R<5> is an imidazolyl substituted with hydrogen or C1-6alkyl; R<6> hydrogen, hydroxy, halo, cyano, optionally substituted C1-6alkyl, C1-6alkyloxycarbonyl or Ar; or a radical of formula -O-R<7>, -S-R<8>, -N-R<8>R<9>; and Ar is optionally substituted phenyl; having farnesyl transferase inhibiting activity; their preparation, compositions containing them and their use as a medicine.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 471/06; A61K 31/47; C07D 498/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07D 215/06 (2006.01); A61K 31/47 (2006.01); A61K 31/4704 (2006.01); A61K 31/4709 (2006.01); A61K 31/4741 (2006.01); A61K 31/4745 (2006.01); A61K 31/5383 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); C07D 401/10 (2006.01); C07D 401/14 (2006.01); C07D 455/04 (2006.01); C07D 471/04 (2006.01); C07D 471/06 (2006.01); C07D 491/048 (2006.01); C07D 491/052 (2006.01); C07D 498/04 (2006.01); C07D 498/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 471/06 (2013.01); C07D 455/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9840383A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9840383 A1 19980917; AT 251159 T 20031015; AU 7031898 A 19980929; AU 748702 B2 20020613; BR 9808843 A 20000704; CA 2283587 A1 19980917; CA 2283587 C 20070501; CN 1128797 C 20031126; CN 1249753 A 20000405; DE 69818649 D1 20031106; DE 69818649 T2 20040701; EP 0970079 A1 20000112; EP 0970079 B1 20031001; ES 2209127 T3 20040616; HK 1024689 A1 20040305; HU 0001498 A2 20001128; HU 0001498 A3 20010129; IL 130362 A 20040219; IL 130362 D0 20000601; JP 2001515487 A 20010918; JP 4272262 B2 20090603; NO 313143 B1 20020819; NO 994268 A 19991108; NO 994268 D0 19990902; NZ 336234 A 20001027; PL 191564 B1 20060630; PL 335518 A1 20000425; RU 2204553 C2 20030520; SK 121799 A3 20000516; SK 283927 B6 20040504; TR 9902203 T2 19991221; TW 591030 B 20040611; US 2002049327 A1 20020425; US 6187786 B1 20010213; US 6444812 B1 20020903

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160324

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160311

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160302

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160215

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160208

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160211

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160223

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160311

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040301

2005-12-29 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2005-03-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-03 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050303

2005-03-03 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050303

2004-09-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040702

2004-07-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2209127

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-03-25 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Ref Legal Event Code: LTIE

- Effective date: 20031001

2004-03-12 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040312

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-03-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2004-02-27 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040227

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-02-26 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040226

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-01-20 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2004-01-01 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040101

2004-01-01 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040101

2003-11-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69818649

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-11-06

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-10-29 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2003-10-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-10-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-10-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-10-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2003-10-01 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031001

2003-10-01 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031001

2003-10-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031001

2002-05-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020416

2000-01-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991011

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL PAYMENT 19991011;LT PAYMENT 19991011;LV PAYMENT 19991011;MK PAYMENT 19991011;RO PAYMENT 19991011;SI PAYMENT 19991011