Global patent index - EP 0970115 A1

EP 0970115 A1 2000-01-12 - VIRAL PEPTIDES WITH STRUCTURAL HOMOLOGY TO PROTEIN G OF RESPIRATORY SYNCYTIAL VIRUS

Title (en)

VIRAL PEPTIDES WITH STRUCTURAL HOMOLOGY TO PROTEIN G OF RESPIRATORY SYNCYTIAL VIRUS

Title (de)

VIRALE PEPTIDE MIT STRUKTURELLER HOMOLOGIE ZU PROTEIN G AUS RESPIRATORY SYNCYTIAL VIRUS (RSV)

Title (fr)

PEPTIDES VIRAUX PRESENTANT UNE HOMOLOGIE STRUCTURELLE AVEC LA PROTEINE G DU VIRUS RESPIRATOIRE SYNCYTIAL BOVIN

Publication

EP 0970115 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 97923671 A

Priority

  • AU 9700351 W
  • AU PO026596 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9746581A1] This invention relates to compounds having structural homology to a contiguous sequence of amino acids within the sequence representing residues 149-197 of the G protein of respiratory syncytial virus, in which a) no oligosaccharide is linked to potential serine, threonine or asparagine attachment sites; b) four cysteine residues are involved in disulphide linkages; and c) the pattern of disulphide linkage is Cys 173 linked to Cys 186, and Cys 176 linked to Cys 182, and in which said compounds possess a biological activity of respiratory syncytial virus G protein, and also encompass biologically-active peptidomimetic and other analogues of these compounds, and antibodies thereto. The compounds of the invention are useful as therapeutic, diagnostic, and screening agents in relation to Pneumoviruses, especially respiratory syncytial virus.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07K 14/135; A61K 39/155; G01N 33/569; G01N 33/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/02 (2006.01); A61K 31/00 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 39/155 (2006.01); A61K 39/395 (2006.01); A61P 31/00 (2006.01); A61P 31/14 (2006.01); C07K 14/135 (2006.01); C07K 16/08 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12P 21/08 (2006.01); G01N 33/569 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/005 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01); C12N 2760/18522 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] FR 2718452 A1
  • [XD] WO 9614409 A1
  • [X] TRUDEL M ET AL: "PROTECTION OF BALB/C MICE FROM RESPIRATORY SYNCYTIAL VIRUS INFECTION BY IMMUNIZATION WITH A SYNTHETIC PEPTIDE DERIVED FROM THEG GLYCOPROTEIN" VIROLOGY, RAVEN PRESS, NEW YORK, NY, US, vol. 185, 1 December 1991 (1991-12-01), pages 749-757, XP002062551 ISSN: 0042-6822
  • [XD] GARCIA OLGA ET AL: "Evolutionary pattern of human respiratory syncytial virus (Subgroup A): Cocirculating lineages and correlation of genetic and antigenic changes in the G glycoprotein." JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, vol. 68, no. 9, 1994, pages 5448-5459, XP001018357 ISSN: 0022-538X
  • [X] SIMARD C ET AL: "EVIDENCE THAT THE AMINO ACID REGION 124-203 OF GLYCOPROTEIN G FROM THE RESPIRATORY SYNCYTIAL VIRUS (RSV) CONSTITUES A MAJOR PART OF THE POLYPEPTIDE DOMAIN THAT IS INVOLVED IN THE PROTECTION AGAINST RSV INFECTION" ANTIVIRAL RESEARCH, ELSEVIER SCIENCE BV., AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 28, no. 4, 1995, pages 303-315, XP000565377 ISSN: 0166-3542
  • [XPD] DORELEIJERS JURGEN F ET AL: "Solution structure of the immunodominant region of protein G of bovine respiratory syncytial virus." BIOCHEMISTRY, vol. 35, no. 47, 26 November 1996 (1996-11-26), pages 14684-14688, XP001018064 ISSN: 0006-2960
  • [XP] SIMARD CLAIRE ET AL: "Subgroup specific protection of mice from respiratory syncytial virus infection with peptides encompassing the amino acid region 174-187 from the G glycoprotein: The role of cysteinyl residues in protection." VACCINE, vol. 15, no. 4, 1997, pages 423-432, XP004058413 ISSN: 0264-410X
  • [XP] LANGEDIJK JOHANNES P M ET AL: "Antigenic structure of the central conserved region of protein G of bovine respiratory syncytial virus." JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, vol. 71, no. 5, May 1997 (1997-05), pages 4055-4061, XP001021455 ISSN: 0022-538X
  • See also references of WO 9746581A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9746581 A1 19971211; AU PO026596 D0 19960627; CA 2257943 A1 19971211; CN 1227565 A 19990901; EP 0970115 A1 20000112; EP 0970115 A4 20020213; JP 2000512136 A 20000919; NZ 333107 A 20000825

INPADOC legal status

2004-09-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040226

2003-09-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030813

2003-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: COMMONWEALTH SCIENTIFIC AND INDUSTRIAL RESEARCH OR

2002-02-13 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020103

2002-02-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981214

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE