Global Patent Index - EP 0970123 A2

EP 0970123 A2 2000-01-12 - GENOMIC SEQUENCE OF THE HUMAN $g(m)-OPIOID RECEPTOR GENE AND THE VARIANTS, POLYMORPHISMS AND MUTATIONS THEREOF

Title (en)

GENOMIC SEQUENCE OF THE HUMAN $g(m)-OPIOID RECEPTOR GENE AND THE VARIANTS, POLYMORPHISMS AND MUTATIONS THEREOF

Title (de)

GENOMISCHE SEQUENZ DES HUMANEN $g(m)-OPIOID-REZEPTOR GENES SOWIE SEINER VARIANTEN, POLYMORPHISMEN UND MUTATIONEN

Title (fr)

SEQUENCE GENOMIQUE DU GENE RECEPTEUR $g(m)-OPIOIDE HUMAIN, AINSI QUE SES VARIANTES, POLYMORPHISMES ET MUTATIONS

Publication

EP 0970123 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 98910609 A

Priority

  • DE 9800382 W
  • DE 19703925 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9833937A2] The invention relates to the genomic sequence of the human mu -opioid receptor gene and the variants, polymorphisms and mutations thereof.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07K 14/705; A61K 38/17; C12N 15/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/705 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/705 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9833937A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9833937 A2 19980806; WO 9833937 A3 19980917; AU 6494798 A 19980825; DE 19806186 A1 19981126; EP 0970123 A2 20000112; US 6538120 B1 20030325

INPADOC legal status


2006-09-08 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1027113

2005-09-14 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050714

2003-08-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030714

2000-07-26 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: GENOMIC SEQUENCE OF THE HUMAN MICRA-OPIOID RECEPTOR GENE AND THE VARIANTS, POLYMORPHISMS AND MUTATIONS THEREOF

2000-01-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990823

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE