Global Patent Index - EP 0970169 A4

EP 0970169 A4 2000-01-12 - DETERGENT COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING A MIXTURE OF QUATERNARY AMMONIUM CATIONIC SURFACTANT AND ALKYL SULFATE ANIONIC SURFACTANT

Title (en)

DETERGENT COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING A MIXTURE OF QUATERNARY AMMONIUM CATIONIC SURFACTANT AND ALKYL SULFATE ANIONIC SURFACTANT

Title (de)

WASCHMITTEL ENTHALTEND EINE MISCHUNG AUS EINEM QUATERNÄREN AMMONIUMTENSID SOWIE EINEM ALKYLSULFAT

Title (fr)

COMPOSITION DETERGENTES COMPRENANT UN MELANGE D'UN TENSIOACTIF CATIONIQUE QUATERNAIRE ET D'UN TENSIOACTIF ANIONIQUE D'ALKYLE SULFATE

Publication

EP 0970169 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97910765 A

Priority

  • GB 9621799 A
  • GB 9621791 A
  • GB 9705802 A
  • US 9717783 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9817759A1] The present invention relates to detergent compositions or components thereof containing a cationic surfactant of the formula: R<1>R<2>R<3>R<4>N<+> X<->, in which R<1> is a hydroxyalkyl group having no greater than 6 carbon atoms; each of R<2> and R<3> is independently selected from C1-4 alkyl or alkenyl; R<4> is a C5-11 alkyl or alkenyl; and X<-> is a counterion; and an anionic surfactant of the formula: R<5>OSO3<->M<+> in which R<5> is an alkyl or alkenyl group having at least 14 carbons atoms and M<+> is a counterion.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 1/65; C11D 1/12; C11D 1/14; C11D 1/62; C11D 1/94

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/22 (2006.01); C11D 1/28 (2006.01); C11D 1/62 (2006.01); C11D 1/65 (2006.01); C11D 1/66 (2006.01); C11D 1/835 (2006.01); C11D 1/86 (2006.01); C11D 3/10 (2006.01); C11D 3/12 (2006.01); C11D 3/37 (2006.01); C11D 3/386 (2006.01); C11D 3/39 (2006.01); C11D 17/00 (2006.01); C11D 1/14 (2006.01); C11D 1/52 (2006.01); C11D 1/72 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/86 (2013.01); C11D 1/22 (2013.01); C11D 1/28 (2013.01); C11D 1/62 (2013.01); C11D 1/65 (2013.01); C11D 1/66 (2013.01); C11D 1/835 (2013.01); C11D 3/10 (2013.01); C11D 3/1273 (2013.01); C11D 3/128 (2013.01); C11D 3/37 (2013.01); C11D 3/3723 (2013.01); C11D 3/38645 (2013.01); C11D 3/3942 (2013.01); C11D 3/3945 (2013.01); C11D 17/0069 (2013.01); C11D 1/143 (2013.01); C11D 1/146 (2013.01); C11D 1/525 (2013.01); C11D 1/662 (2013.01); C11D 1/72 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9817759 A1 19980430; AR 010003 A1 20000517; AT 223956 T 20020915; BR 9712363 A 19990831; CA 2268518 A1 19980430; CA 2268518 C 20020820; DE 69715463 D1 20021017; DE 69715463 T2 20030807; EP 0970169 A1 20000112; EP 0970169 A4 20000112; EP 0970169 B1 20020911; MA 24380 A1 19980701; MX 9903632 A 19990801

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151002

2016-06-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20151002

2014-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140925

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-08-09 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69715463

- Effective date: 20120501

2012-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120501

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101029

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071031

2008-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20061003

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-10-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080630

2003-09-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-08-06 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2003-04-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030328

2003-03-27 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-03-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-12-17 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021217

2002-12-11 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021211

2002-12-11 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021211

2002-10-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69715463 20021017

2002-10-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2002-10-02 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021002

2002-10-02 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021002

2002-09-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2002-09-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-09-11 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020911

2002-09-11 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020911

2002-09-11 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020911

2002-09-11 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020911

2002-09-11 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020911

2002-09-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020911

2002-09-11 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020911

2002-09-11 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020911

2002-09-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 223956 T 20020915

2002-09-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HALL, ROBIN GIBSON

2002-09-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MOSS, MICHAEL ALAN JOHN

2000-11-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000925

2000-01-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990501

2000-01-12 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 19991109

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE