Global patent index - EP 0970181 A1

EP 0970181 A1 2000-01-12 - PRESSED PIECE WHICH DISINTEGRATES IN LIQUIDS

Title (en)

PRESSED PIECE WHICH DISINTEGRATES IN LIQUIDS

Title (de)

IN FLÜSSIGKEIT ZERFALLENDER PRESSLING

Title (fr)

PIECE MOULEE PAR COMPRESSION SE DECOMPOSANT DANS LES LIQUIDES

Publication

EP 0970181 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98916813 A

Priority

  • DE 9800589 W
  • DE 19709991 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19709991A1] The invention relates to a pressed piece consisting of ingredients in powder and/or granular form, which contains particles made of a material containing cellulose, particularly in compacted form, which act as an explosive agent. TMP and CTMP can be used as the cellulose-containing material.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 17/00; C11D 3/22; C11D 3/382; C11D 7/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/22 (2006.01); C11D 3/382 (2006.01); C11D 7/44 (2006.01); C11D 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/222 (2013.01); C11D 3/382 (2013.01); C11D 7/44 (2013.01); C11D 17/0073 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9840462A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19709991 A1 19980917; DE 19709991 C2 19991223; AT 205875 T 20011015; DE 19758811 B4 20081218; DK 0970181 T3 20020128; EP 0970181 A1 20000112; EP 0970181 B1 20010919; ES 2165155 T3 20020301; PT 970181 E 20011228; US 7008912 B1 20060307; WO 9840462 A1 19980917

INPADOC legal status

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160218

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160218

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160210

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160223

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150226

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150226

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150226

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150319

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150226

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150226

- Year of fee payment: 18

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *HENKEL K.G.A.A.

- Effective date: 20050228

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: J. *RETTENMAIER & SOHNE G.M.B.H. + CO.

- Effective date: 20050228

2007-01-24 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20061106

2007-01-24 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: DALLI-WERKE GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20010922

2005-11-30 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2005-11-01 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-11-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050901

2005-10-31 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES;SEARCHED & EXAMINED PATENT

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

- Effective date: 20050831

2005-10-03 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2005-09-05 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050905

2005-09-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050901

2005-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *HENKEL K.G.A.A.

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: J. *RETTENMAIER & SOHNE G.M.B.H. + CO.

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-08-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050831

2005-05-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: DALLI-WERKE GMBH & CO. KG

2005-03-16 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: DALLI-WERKE GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20010922

2005-03-01 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050301

2005-02-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-02-28 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-02-28 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-02-28 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-02-28 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-02-28 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2004-03-08 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20040308

- Year of fee payment: 07

2004-02-27 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20040227

- Year of fee payment: 07

2004-02-27 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20040227

- Year of fee payment: 07

2004-02-25 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20040225

- Year of fee payment: 07

2004-02-24 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20040224

- Year of fee payment: 07

2004-02-23 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20040223

- Year of fee payment: 07

2004-02-20 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20040220

- Year of fee payment: 07

2004-02-19 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20040219

- Year of fee payment: 07

2004-02-17 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20040217

- Year of fee payment: 07

2004-02-16 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20040216

- Year of fee payment: 07

2004-01-23 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20040123

- Year of fee payment: 07

2002-03-29 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

- Ref Document Number: 20010402276

- Country of Ref Document: GR

2002-03-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: J. RETTENMAIER & SOEHNE GMBH + CO. KG EN HENKEL KG

2002-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2165155

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2002-02-28 [REG PT PD4A] CHANGE OF PROPRIETORSHIP

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PD4A

- Free Format Text: J. RETTENMAIER & SOHNE GMBH + CO. KG DE

- Effective date: 20011128

2002-01-28 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2002-01-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: DALLI-WERKE WAESCHE-UND KOERPERPFLEGE GMBH & CO KG

2002-01-02 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLICATION

- Owner name: HENKEL KGAA

2002-01-02 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLICATION

- Owner name: J. RETTENMAIER & SOEHNE GMBH + CO. KG

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-12-28 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20010926

2001-11-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-11-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: R. A. EGLI & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2001-11-14 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: DALLI-WERKE WAESCHE-UND KOERPERPFLEGE GMBH & CO KG

- Effective date: 20010922

2001-10-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59801528

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20011025

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2001-10-17 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2001-10-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010919

2001-09-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2001-09-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 205875

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 20011015

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2001-02-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010115

2000-09-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HOLL, MARTIN

2000-09-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KRUSE, HANS-FRIEDRICH

2000-09-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: RETTENMAIER, JOSEF, OTTO

2000-09-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHLOSSER, HARALD

2000-09-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: UNGERER, ARMIN

2000-09-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: HENKEL KGAA

2000-09-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: J. RETTENMAIER & SOEHNE GMBH + CO.

2000-01-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990917

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE