Global Patent Index - EP 0970185 A1

EP 0970185 A1 2000-01-12 - INSECTICIDAL PROTEIN TOXINS FROM $I(PHOTORHABDUS)

Title (en)

INSECTICIDAL PROTEIN TOXINS FROM $I(PHOTORHABDUS)

Title (de)

INSEKTIZIDE PROTEINTOXINE AUS PHOTORHABDUS

Title (fr)

TOXINES PROTEINIQUES INSECTICIDES ISOLEES A PARTIR DE $i(PHOTORHABDUS)

Publication

EP 0970185 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 97922696 A

Priority

  • US 9707657 W
  • US 70548496 A
  • US 74369996 A
  • US 9618003 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9808932A1] Proteins from the genus Photorhabdus are toxic to insects upon exposure. Photorhabdus luminescens (formerly Xenorhabdus luminescens) have been found in mammalian clinical samples and as a bacterial symbiont of entomopathogenic nematodes of genus Heterorhabditis. These protein toxins can be applied to, or genetically engineered into, insect larvae food and plants for insect control.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 1/00; A01G 13/00; A01H 1/00; A01H 3/00; C12N 1/20; C12N 15/00; C12N 15/09; C12N 15/10; C12N 15/29; C12N 15/31; C12N 15/82

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01H 5/00 (2006.01); A01G 13/00 (2006.01); A01H 1/00 (2006.01); A01H 3/00 (2006.01); A01H 4/00 (2006.01); A01N 63/00 (2006.01); A01N 63/02 (2006.01); C07H 21/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/195 (2006.01); C07K 16/12 (2006.01); C12N 1/00 (2006.01); C12N 1/15 (2006.01); C12N 1/19 (2006.01); C12N 1/20 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/00 (2006.01); C12N 15/02 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12N 15/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/29 (2006.01); C12N 15/31 (2006.01); C12N 15/82 (2006.01); C12P 21/02 (2006.01); C12P 21/08 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01); C12R 1/01 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/195 (2013.01); A01N 63/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9808932 A1 19980305; AR 007133 A1 19991013; AU 2829997 A 19980319; CA 2263819 A1 19980305; EP 0970185 A1 20000112; EP 0970185 A4 20030226; IL 128590 D0 20000131; JP 2000515024 A 20001114; KR 20000037116 A 20000705; SK 24699 A3 20000410; TR 199901126 T2 19990721; TW 509722 B 20021111

INPADOC legal status


2003-10-29 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030326

2003-02-26 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030110

2002-11-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 12N 1/00 A, 7C 12N 1/20 B, 7C 12N 15/00 B, 7C 12N 15/09 B, 7C 12N 15/10 B, 7C 12N 15/29 B, 7C 12N 15/31 B, 7C 12N 15/82 B, 7A 01G 13/00 B, 7A 01H 1/00 B, 7A 01H 3/00 B, 7A 01H 4/00 B, 7A 01H 5/00 B

2000-07-26 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: INSECTICIDAL PROTEIN TOXINS FROM PHOTORHABDUS

2000-01-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990305

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE