Global Patent Index - EP 0970202 A2

EP 0970202 A2 2000-01-12 - CHARACTERIZATION OF THE YEAST TRANSCRIPTOME

Title (en)

CHARACTERIZATION OF THE YEAST TRANSCRIPTOME

Title (de)

CHARAKTERISIERUNG DES HEFE-TRANSCRIPTOMS

Title (fr)

CARACTERISATION DU TRANSCRIPTOME DE LEVURE

Publication

EP 0970202 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 98902680 A

Priority

  • US 9801216 W
  • US 3591797 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9832847A2] Yeast genes which are differentially expressed during the cell cycle are described. They can be used to study, affect, and monitor the cell cycle of a eukaryotic cell. They can be used to obtain human homologs involved in cell cycle regulation. They can be used to identify antifungal agents. They can be formed into arrays on solid supports for interrogation of a cell's transcriptome under various conditions.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/10; C07K 14/395; C12N 15/31; C12Q 1/02; C12Q 1/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C07K 14/395 (2006.01); C12Q 1/02 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01); C12R 1/85 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/395 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9832847A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL LT LV MK RO SI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9832847 A2 19980730; WO 9832847 A3 19981126; AU 5928098 A 19980818; AU 749606 B2 20020627; AU 749606 C 20070517; CA 2278645 A1 19980730; EP 0970202 A2 20000112; JP 2001509017 A 20010710

INPADOC legal status


2009-01-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20080805

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: VELCULESCU, VICTOR E.

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: VOGELSTEIN, BERT

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: KINZLER, KENNETH, W.

2003-11-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031013

2000-07-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: VELCULESCU, VICTOR E.

2000-07-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: VOGELSTEIN, BERT

2000-07-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: KINZLER, KENNETH, W.

2000-01-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990810

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL PAYMENT 19990810;LT PAYMENT 19990810;LV PAYMENT 19990810;MK PAYMENT 19990810;RO PAYMENT 19990810;SI PAYMENT 19990810