Global Patent Index - EP 0970260 A1

EP 0970260 A1 2000-01-12 - PROCESS FOR QUENCHING HEAT TREATABLE METAL ALLOYS

Title (en)

PROCESS FOR QUENCHING HEAT TREATABLE METAL ALLOYS

Title (de)

ABSCHRECHUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR WÄRMEBEHANDLUNGSFÄHIGEN LEGIERUNGEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE TREMPE ADAPTABLE POUR DES ALLIAGES METALLIQUES APTES AU TRAITEMENT THERMIQUE

Publication

EP 0970260 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98913057 A

Priority

  • US 9805689 W
  • US 4154097 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9842885A1] The present invention is directed to a process comprised of a controllably variable liquid quenching means for metal alloys at or above the Leidenfrost temperature without metal alloy distortion.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22F 1/057; C21D 1/56; C21D 1/60; C21D 1/667; C22F 1/047; C22F 1/053

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22F 1/00 (2006.01); C21D 1/00 (2006.01); C21D 1/56 (2006.01); C21D 1/60 (2006.01); C21D 1/667 (2006.01); C22F 1/04 (2006.01); C22F 1/043 (2006.01); C22F 1/047 (2006.01); C22F 1/053 (2006.01); C22F 1/057 (2006.01); C22F 1/06 (2006.01); C22F 1/18 (2006.01); C21D 1/613 (2006.01); C21D 9/573 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C21D 1/56 (2013.01); C21D 1/60 (2013.01); C21D 1/667 (2013.01); C22F 1/04 (2013.01); C22F 1/047 (2013.01); C22F 1/053 (2013.01); C22F 1/057 (2013.01); C21D 1/613 (2013.01); C21D 9/573 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9842885A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9842885 A1 19981001; AU 6769498 A 19981020; BR 9808090 A 20000308; CA 2284926 A1 19981001; DE 69825734 D1 20040923; DE 69825734 T2 20050825; EP 0970260 A1 20000112; EP 0970260 B1 20040818; JP 2001518144 A 20011009; US 6368430 B1 20020409

INPADOC legal status


2007-01-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-01-10 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20060713

2006-03-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060330

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-03-08 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20060308

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-07-20 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: PECHINEY

- Effective date: 20050518

2005-07-20 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: NOVELIS, INC.

- Effective date: 20050518

2005-06-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-03-02 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050302

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE

2004-09-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69825734 P 20040923

2004-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-08-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR LI

2002-09-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020812

2000-01-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991019

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR LI