Global patent index - EP 0970269 A1

EP 0970269 A1 2000-01-12 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING POLYAMIDE MONOFILAMENTS AND MONOFILAMENT FOR TECHNICAL FABRIC

Title (en)

METHOD FOR PRODUCING POLYAMIDE MONOFILAMENTS AND MONOFILAMENT FOR TECHNICAL FABRIC

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON MONOFILAMENTEN AUS POLYAMID UND MONOFILAMENT FÜR TECHNISCHE GEWEBE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR PRODUIRE DES MONOFILAMENTS EN POLYAMIDE ET MONOFILAMENT POUR TISSUS TECHNIQUES

Publication

EP 0970269 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98906784 A

Priority

  • CH 9800100 W
  • CH 66997 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9842900A1] The present invention concerns a method for producing round polyamide monofilaments which are free of pinholes and heat-resistant for use in technical fabric. A mixture of 75 to 85 wt-percent-PA 66 and more than 15 to 25 wt-percent-PA 6 is produced immediately prior to extrusion, spun, and immediately cooled in a liquid. The monofilament in a titer range from 0.8 to 1.5mm diameter is intended for technical fabric and has a resistance greater than 40 cN/tex, a thermal resistance of </=55 %, and a melting point range between 235-260 DEG C.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01F 6/90

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01F 6/90 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01F 6/90 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9842900A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI LU NL PT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9842900 A1 19981001; AR 011096 A1 20000802; AT 223981 T 20020915; BR 9808286 A 20000516; DE 59805514 D1 20021017; DK 0970269 T3 20030908; EA 000984 B1 20000828; EP 0970269 A1 20000112; EP 0970269 B1 20020911; ID 22387 A 19991007; JP 2001518152 A 20011009; KR 20000076341 A 20001226; PT 970269 E 20030331; US 6238608 B1 20010529

INPADOC legal status

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *RHODIA INDUSTRIAL YARNS A.G.

- Effective date: 20050331

2006-06-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20050317

2005-12-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-12-29 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2005-12-12 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2005-11-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050316

2005-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2005-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051001

2005-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *RHODIA INDUSTRIAL YARNS A.G.

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-17 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050317

2005-03-16 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050316

2005-03-16 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050316

2005-03-16 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050316

2005-03-16 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050316

2005-03-16 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050316

2004-05-19 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20040519

- Year of fee payment: 07

2004-03-25 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040325

- Year of fee payment: 07

2004-03-18 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040318

- Year of fee payment: 07

2004-03-17 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20040317

- Year of fee payment: 07

2004-03-16 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20040316

- Year of fee payment: 07

2004-03-12 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20040312

- Year of fee payment: 07

2004-03-12 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20040312

- Year of fee payment: 07

2004-03-11 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20040311

- Year of fee payment: 07

2004-03-11 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20040311

- Year of fee payment: 07

2004-03-10 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040310

- Year of fee payment: 07

2004-03-09 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040309

- Year of fee payment: 07

2004-01-23 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20040123

- Year of fee payment: 07

2003-11-03 [NLXE] NL: OTHER COMMUNICATIONS CONCERNING EP-PATENTS (PART 3 HEADING XE)

- Free Format Text: THE REQUEST FOR RESTORATION TO THE PRIOR STATE AS PROVIDED FOR IN ARTICLE 23 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995 (SEE PUBLICATION IN HEADING XE OF THE PATENT BULLETIN OF 20030501/05) HAS BEEN REJECTED.

2003-09-08 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2003-09-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-09-01 [REG DK EGE] RE-ESTABLISHMENT OF RIGHTS: APPROVED

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: EGE

2003-08-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-06-27 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-06-20 [REG FR FC] FAVOURABLE DECISION OF INPI DIRECTOR GENERAL ON AN APPLICATION FOR RESTAURATION.

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: FC

2003-05-01 [NLXE] NL: OTHER COMMUNICATIONS CONCERNING EP-PATENTS (PART 3 HEADING XE)

- Free Format Text: A REQUEST FOR RESTORATION TO THE PRIOR STATE (ARTICLE 23 OF THE PATENTS ACT) HAS BEEN FILED ON 20030221.

2003-04-18 [REG FR RN] APPLICATION FOR RESTORATION

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: RN

2003-03-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20030115

2003-03-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: KIRKER & CIE SA

2003-03-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT; NO LEGAL EFFECT FROM

2002-12-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021130

2002-12-17 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021217

2002-10-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59805514

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20021017

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2002-10-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2002-09-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI LU NL PT

2002-09-11 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020911

2002-09-11 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020911

2002-09-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 223981

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 20020915

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2002-09-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-01-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011211

2001-01-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: RHODIA INDUSTRIAL YARNS AG

2000-01-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990830

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI LU NL PT