Global Patent Index - EP 0970270 A1

EP 0970270 A1 2000-01-12 - WOVEN 3D FABRIC MATERIAL

Title (en)

WOVEN 3D FABRIC MATERIAL

Title (de)

DREIDIMENSIONAL GEWEBTES TEXTILMATERIAL

Title (fr)

MATIERE EN TISSU TISSE EN 3D

Publication

EP 0970270 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 97919801 A

Priority

SE 9700356 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9839508A1] A woven 3D fabric material (12u) comprises multilayer axial warp yarns (6) and two orthogonal sets of weft (7 and 8) which interlace with the rows and the columns of the warp (6) respectively to provide integrity to the fabric which may additionally incorporate between the rows and the columns of the interlacing warp (6) sets of non-interlacing multi-directionally orientated yarns (6ps, 9c, 9a, 9b and 9d) in the fabric-length, -width, -thickness, and two diagonal directions respectively to improve the fabric's mechanical properties. The interlacing of the multilayer warp (6) and the two orthogonal sets of weft (7 and 8) is enabled by a dual-directional shedding means which forms sheds in the row-wise and the column wise directions of the multilayer warp. The produced woven 3D fabric material which may be cut into any desired shape without the risk of splitting up, may be wholly or in parts in technical applications.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03D 25/00; D03D 41/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03D 25/00 (2006.01); D03D 41/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 25/005 (2013.01); D03D 41/004 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9839508A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9839508 A1 19980911; AT 267281 T 20040615; CA 2279848 A1 19980911; CA 2279848 C 20060509; DE 69729221 D1 20040624; DE 69729221 T2 20050623; EP 0970270 A1 20000112; EP 0970270 B1 20040519; HK 1025138 A1 20021025; JP 2001513856 A 20010904; JP 3860222 B2 20061220; US 6338367 B1 20020115

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170302

2017-05-02 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2017-03-22 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20170302

2017-03-03 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69729221

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160324

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160330

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-03-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041019

2005-12-29 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2005-05-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050222

2005-03-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-03 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050303

2005-03-03 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050303

2005-02-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-11-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-11-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-10-25 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20040519

2004-09-07 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-08-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040830

2004-08-19 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040819

2004-08-19 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040819

2004-06-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69729221 P 20040624

2004-06-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-05-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-05-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-05-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV RO SI

2004-05-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-05-19 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040519

2004-05-19 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040519

2004-05-19 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040519

2004-05-19 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040519

2004-05-19 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040519

2004-05-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KHOKAR, NANDAN,MIBROUS MATERIAL GROUP

2001-10-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010917

2000-01-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990821

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 19990821;LT PAYMENT 19990821;LV PAYMENT 19990821;RO PAYMENT 19990821;SI PAYMENT 19990821