Global patent index - EP 0970273 A1

EP 0970273 A1 2000-01-12 - PROCESS FOR PREPARING CARPETS HAVING POLYURETHANE BACKINGS OBTAINED FROM POLYURETHANE LATEX FORMULATIONS

Title (en)

PROCESS FOR PREPARING CARPETS HAVING POLYURETHANE BACKINGS OBTAINED FROM POLYURETHANE LATEX FORMULATIONS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON TEPPICHEN MIT POLYURETHAN-RÜCKENBESCHICHTUNG AUS POLYURETHANLATEX

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE TAPIS MUNIS D'UN DOSSIER EN POLYURETHANE REALISEE A PARTIR DE FORMULATIONS DE LATEX A BASE DE POLYURETHANE

Publication

EP 0970273 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98910417 A

Priority

  • US 9805079 W
  • US 4125597 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9841681A1] The present invention is a polyurethane backed carpet having a backing prepared by application of an aqueous dispersion of a polyurethane or a polyurethane-forming material to the back of a carpet substrate. The present invention can eliminate the need to prepare a polyurethane backing from its monomeric components at the carpet manufacturing site. The polyurethane backed carpet of the present invention can be efficiently prepared by a continuous process.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06N 7/00; D06N 3/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47G 27/02 (2006.01); D06N 3/14 (2006.01); D06N 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06N 3/14 (2013.01); D06N 7/0073 (2013.01); D06N 7/0086 (2013.01); D06N 2203/042 (2013.01); D06N 2203/065 (2013.01); D06N 2203/068 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9841681A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9841681 A1 19980924; AR 012081 A1 20000927; AT 223530 T 20020915; AU 6466498 A 19981012; AU 727413 B2 20001214; BR 9808342 A 20000404; CA 2283909 A1 19980924; CN 1136356 C 20040128; CN 1250497 A 20000412; CO 5021193 A1 20010327; DE 69807673 D1 20021010; DE 69807673 T2 20030102; DK 0970273 T3 20021230; EP 0970273 A1 20000112; EP 0970273 B1 20020904; ES 2178175 T3 20021216; HU 0001810 A2 20000928; HU 0001810 A3 20010928; ID 22943 A 19991216; JP 2001518148 A 20011009; KR 20000076296 A 20001226; NO 994492 A 19991117; NO 994492 D0 19990916; PL 335738 A1 20000508; RO 120414 B1 20060130; TR 9902224 T2 20000522; ZA 9802195 B 20000113

INPADOC legal status

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100317

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110404

2011-04-29 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100331

2011-04-19 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20110419

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100316

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100316

2011-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100331

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101001

2011-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100331

2011-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101001

2010-12-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20101130

2010-11-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100316

2010-11-08 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2010-10-13 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20101001

2010-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: THE *DOW CHEMICAL CY

- Effective date: 20100331

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090316

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20090401

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090313

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090318

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090428

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090311

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-05-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20090303

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20090313

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-11-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-04-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2002-12-30 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2002-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2178175

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-12-13 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021213

2002-12-04 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021204

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 69807673

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20021010

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2002-09-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: FIAMMENGHI-FIAMMENGHI

2002-09-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL PAYMENT 19991018;RO PAYMENT 19991018

2002-09-04 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-09-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 223530

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 20020915

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2002-09-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2001-12-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011031

2000-01-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991018

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL PAYMENT 19991018;RO PAYMENT 19991018