Global Patent Index - EP 0970281 A1

EP 0970281 A1 2000-01-12 - METHOD FOR STABILIZING EMBANKMENTS

Title (en)

METHOD FOR STABILIZING EMBANKMENTS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM STABILISIEREN EINER BÖSCHUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR STABILISER UN REMBLAI

Publication

EP 0970281 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98932014 A

Priority

  • DE 9801169 W
  • DE 19718220 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19725077A1] The plugging of the embankment is carried out with the aid of wooden posts or metal components arranged in a grid. Starting from the inclined surface of the embankment holes arranged in a grid are made in the base. They are filled with a self-binding mass (7,8). The holes are made with a drilling machine and are filled under pressure. The self-binding mass is used in conjunction with reinforcement fibres. Where a dam (1) is involved with two embankments, the base forming the dam, starting from both embankment surfaces, is plugged in a horizontal direction. The plugged area overlap each other.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02D 5/80; E02D 29/055; E21D 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02D 17/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02D 17/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9849399A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19725077 A1 19980723; AT 220150 T 20020715; EP 0970281 A1 20000112; EP 0970281 B1 20020703; PL 336575 A1 20000703; WO 9849399 A1 19981105

INPADOC legal status


2015-02-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140428

2015-02-05 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59804668

- Effective date: 20141101

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141101

2014-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 220150 T

- Effective date: 20140428

2014-11-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59804668

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130430

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20120420

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-01-10 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: BILFINGER SE, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: BILFINGER BERGER SE, 68165 MANNHEIM, DE

- Document: DE 59804668

- Effective date: 20121115

2013-01-10 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59804668

- Representative's name: ULLRICH & NAUMANN, DE

- Effective date: 20121115

2013-01-10 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59804668

- Representative's name: PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE ULLRICH & NAUMANN P, DE

- Effective date: 20121115

2012-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100430

2012-04-19 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: BILFINGER SE, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: BILFINGER BERGER AG, 68165 MANNHEIM, DE

- Document: DE 59804668

- Effective date: 20120229

2012-04-19 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59804668

- Representative's name: ULLRICH & NAUMANN, DE

- Effective date: 20120229

2012-04-19 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59804668

- Representative's name: PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE ULLRICH & NAUMANN P, DE

- Effective date: 20120229

2012-02-29 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59804668

- Representative's name: ULLRICH & NAUMANN, DE

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100428

2011-01-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101230

2010-12-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100428

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090424

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090420

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *BILFINGER BERGER A.G.

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-06-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030404

2003-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030430

2002-12-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2002-08-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59804668 20020808

2002-07-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR GB

2002-07-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 220150 T 20020715

2001-11-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BILFINGER BERGER AG

2001-10-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010904

2000-01-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991008

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR GB