Global Patent Index - EP 0970297 A2

EP 0970297 A2 2000-01-12 - ELECTROMAGNETIC CONTROL DEVICE

Title (en)

ELECTROMAGNETIC CONTROL DEVICE

Title (de)

ELEKTROMAGNETISCHE STELLEINRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE ELECTROMAGNETIQUE

Publication

EP 0970297 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 98919134 A

Priority

  • DE 19712062 A
  • DE 19712057 A
  • DE 19714410 A
  • DE 19714409 A
  • EP 9801710 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9842955A2] The invention relates to an electromagnetic drive mechanism, wherein two opposite lying electromagnets displace an armature placed therebetween from an intermediate spring-determined position to one of two end positions. The electromagnets are configured as bipolar electromagnets. An electrically driven mechanical locking system is provided for the armature so that it can be maintained in the end positions without requiring any power.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01L 9/04; H01F 7/123; H01F 7/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 9/04 (2006.01); H01F 7/13 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01L 9/04 (2013.01); H01F 7/13 (2013.01); F01L 2009/0409 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9842955A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9842955 A2 19981001; WO 9842955 A3 19990304; EP 0970297 A2 20000112; EP 0970297 B1 20011031

INPADOC legal status


2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071002

2006-04-04 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060404

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-01-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2003-11-12 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030324

2003-04-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030417

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-03-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030324

2002-10-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-03-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-03-05 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020305

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-01-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020131

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59801964 20011206

2001-11-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20011031

2001-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2001-10-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011031

2000-05-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000403

2000-01-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990831

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE