Global Patent Index - EP 0970299 A1

EP 0970299 A1 2000-01-12 - INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (en)

INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (de)

VERBRENNUNGSMOTOR

Title (fr)

MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE

Publication

EP 0970299 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98920484 A

Priority

  • DE 19712054 A
  • DE 19741569 A
  • EP 9801706 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9842956A1] The invention relates to an internal combustion engine comprising an electromagnetic valve drive mechanism. The engine also has static high-voltage distribution with individual or multiple spark ignition coils. The iron core (5) of one of the electromagnets (2, 3) of the drive mechanism is also used as an ignition coil (15, 16) core.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01L 9/04; F02P 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 9/04 (2006.01); F02P 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01L 9/04 (2013.01); F02P 3/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9842956A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9842956 A1 19981001; EP 0970299 A1 20000112; EP 0970299 B1 20010620

INPADOC legal status


2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081001

2007-04-02 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070402

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-03-24 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050324

2005-01-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2003-04-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030417

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-06-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-12-19 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20010620

2001-11-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-09-20 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010920

2001-07-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59800893 20010726

2001-06-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2001-06-20 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010620

2000-12-27 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-07-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000530

2000-01-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990831

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE