Global patent index - EP 0970304 A1

EP 0970304 A1 2000-01-12 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING PRESSURE IN STORAGE INJECTION SYSTEMS WITH AN ELECTROMAGNETICALLY ACTUATED PRESSURE CONTROL MEMBER

Title (en)

DEVICE AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING PRESSURE IN STORAGE INJECTION SYSTEMS WITH AN ELECTROMAGNETICALLY ACTUATED PRESSURE CONTROL MEMBER

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM DRUCKREGELN IN SPEICHEREINSPRITZSYSTEMEN MIT EINEM ELEKTROMAGNETISCH BETÄTIGTEN DRUCKSTELLGLIED

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE REGULATION DE LA PRESSION DANS DES SYSTEMES D'INJECTION A ACCUMULATION AVEC UN ELEMENT D'AJUSTEMENT DE LA PRESSION

Publication

EP 0970304 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99907265 A

Priority

  • DE 9900147 W
  • DE 19802583 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19802583A1] The invention relates to a storage injection system which has a pressure control member (16) with a shut-off body (163) which is actuated by an electromagnetic drive mechanism (165, 167). The pressure is regulated by means of a cascade connection of two control systems. The first control system (191) determines a triggering signal with a desired current value for the electromagnetic drive mechanism and the second control system (192) adapts the current value detected in the electromagnetic drive mechanism to said predetermined desired current value.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/20 (2006.01); F02D 41/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/3863 (2013.01); F02D 41/20 (2013.01); F02D 2041/1409 (2013.01); F02D 2041/1419 (2013.01); F02D 2041/2058 (2013.01); F02D 2200/0602 (2013.01); F02D 2250/31 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9937903A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19802583 A1 19990805; DE 19802583 C2 20020131; EP 0970304 A1 20000112; EP 0970304 B1 20021211; US 6119655 A 20000919; WO 9937903 A1 19990729

INPADOC legal status

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160121

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160120

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160131

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160127

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150122

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150121

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150131

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150127

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-09-21 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20110825 AND 20110831

2011-06-17 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2003-12-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030912

2003-08-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-01-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59903717

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20030123

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2002-12-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021211

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-12-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-01-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011204

2000-01-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990917

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT