Global Patent Index - EP 0970305 A1

EP 0970305 A1 2000-01-12 - INJECTION VALVE WITH CONTROL VALVE

Title (en)

INJECTION VALVE WITH CONTROL VALVE

Title (de)

EINSPRITZVENTIL MIT STEUERVENTIL

Title (fr)

SOUPAPE D'INJECTION A VANNE DE CONTROLE

Publication

EP 0970305 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98966221 A

Priority

  • DE 9803746 W
  • DE 19757656 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9934111A1] The invention relates to an injection valve with a control valve which has a control chamber (1) in which a closing member (10) is arranged which is pushed against a corresponding sealing seat (25) by the fuel pressure in the control chamber (1). The closing member (10) forms part of a rod (11) extending through an outlet hole (5) and connected to a spring seat (13). The spring seat (13) is pretensed by a pressure spring (14) against the housing (36) in such a way that the closing member (10) is pushed against a sealing seat (25) assigned to it. The closing member (10) can be lifted off the sealing seat (25) via an actuating piston (12) which contacts the spring seat (13).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 47/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 47/02 (2006.01); F02M 63/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 47/027 (2013.01); F02M 2200/21 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9934111A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9934111 A1 19990708; EP 0970305 A1 20000112; EP 0970305 B1 20030521; US 6168132 B1 20010102

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151228

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151231

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-09-21 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20110825 AND 20110831

2011-06-17 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2004-05-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040224

2004-03-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-07-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

2003-06-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59808465

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-06-26

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-05-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-05-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-01-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990820

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT