Global patent index - EP 0970307 A1

EP 0970307 A1 2000-01-12 - DEVICE FOR FIXING A FUEL INJECTOR ON AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE CYLINDER HEAD, AND METHOD FOR FIXING SAID INJECTOR

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR FIXING A FUEL INJECTOR ON AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE CYLINDER HEAD, AND METHOD FOR FIXING SAID INJECTOR

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEFESTIGUNG EINER KRAFTSTOFFEINSPRITZDÜSE AM ZYLINDERKOPF EINER BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE UND VERFAHREN ZUR MONTAGE DIESER KRAFTSTOFFEINSPRITZDÜSE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE FIXATION D'UN INJECTEUR DE CARBURANT SUR UNE CULASSE DE MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE, ET UN PROCEDE DE MONTAGE DE CET INJECTEUR

Publication

EP 0970307 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98922907 A

Priority

  • FR 9800874 W
  • FR 9706112 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2763649A1] The invention concerns a device for fixing a fuel injector (12) in an internal combustion engine cylinder head (1) whereon is set a camshaft bracket (4) top surface delimiting with this surface a chamber (8) containing valve-actuating mechanical members. The injector (12) passes through the camshaft bracket (4) and the cylinder head (1) being maintained supported on the base (18) of a recess (14) in the cylinder head by a fork (20) fixed by a screw (26) to the cylinder head (1). The fork (20) is arranged in the chamber (8) under a camshaft (6) extending perpendicular to said shaft (6) and comprises two branches (20a, 20b) which are supported on either side of the injector body (12), in useful fixing position, on two wings (21, 22) symmetrically arranged on the injector (12) body periphery.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 61/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02F 1/24 (2006.01); F02F 7/00 (2006.01); F02M 61/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02F 7/006 (2013.01); F02M 61/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9853197A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES GB IT LI LU PT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2763649 A1 19981127; FR 2763649 B1 19990625; BR 9804900 A 19990831; CN 1085301 C 20020522; CN 1226951 A 19990825; DE 69815084 D1 20030703; DE 69815084 T2 20040219; EP 0970307 A1 20000112; EP 0970307 B1 20030528; ES 2199442 T3 20040216; JP 2000515610 A 20001121; JP 4022264 B2 20071212; US 6170467 B1 20010109; WO 9853197 A1 19981126

INPADOC legal status

2014-03-13 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69815084

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20131101

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131101

2014-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130430

2013-12-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130430

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120326

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-06-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120328

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090430

2010-07-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090504

2010-06-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20090504

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080409

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080404

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-02-14 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: 746

- Effective date: 20070118

2004-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2004-05-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040302

2004-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-04-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2199442

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-08-28 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-07-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 69815084

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20030703

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-06-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-05-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-05-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES GB IT LI LU PT

2003-05-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-04-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020311

2000-01-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990107

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES GB IT LI LU PT