Global patent index - EP 0970309 A1

EP 0970309 A1 2000-01-12 - RADIAL PISTON PUMP FOR FEEDING HIGH PRESSURE FUEL

Title (en)

RADIAL PISTON PUMP FOR FEEDING HIGH PRESSURE FUEL

Title (de)

RADIALKOLBENPUMPE ZUR KRAFTSTOFFHOCHDRUCKVERSORGUNG

Title (fr)

POMPE A PISTONS RADIAUX POUR ALIMENTATION EN CARBURANT SOUS HAUTE PRESSION

Publication

EP 0970309 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98963344 A

Priority

  • DE 9803321 W
  • DE 19753593 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19753593A1] The invention relates to a radial piston pump for feeding high pressure fuel in fuel injection systems of internal combustion engines, more particularly in a common rail injection system, comprising a drive shaft (4) located in a pump housing (2) which has an eccentric configuration or has cam-like protuberances in the peripheral direction, and, preferably, several pistons (12) arranged radially in a corresponding cylinder chamber (18) in relation to the drive shaft (4), which can move back and forth in the radial direction in the corresponding cylinder chamber (18) by rotating the drive shaft (4). As part of the present invention, it was proven that the piston skirt in contact with the drive shaft (4) was damaged during operation. The invention has the aim of providing a radial piston pump, in which damages to the piston skirt are prevented. This is achieved by arranging a transverse force receiving device (9) between the piston (12) and the drive shaft (4). This provides the advantage that only forces in longitudinal direction are exerted on the pistons, which implies that practically no torque is exerted on the pistons.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 1/04; F02M 59/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 59/06 (2006.01); F02M 59/10 (2006.01); F02M 63/02 (2006.01); F04B 1/04 (2006.01); F04B 1/047 (2006.01); F04B 1/053 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 1/0439 (2013.01); F02M 59/06 (2013.01); F02M 63/0225 (2013.01); F04B 1/0421 (2013.01)

Citation (opposition)

Opponent :

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19753593 A1 19990617; EP 0970309 A1 20000112; EP 0970309 B1 20030903; EP 0970309 B2 20090422; JP 2001510531 A 20010731; JP 4308921 B2 20090805; US 6250893 B1 20010626; WO 9928625 A1 19990610

INPADOC legal status

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160126

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150127

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131202

2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131112

2014-08-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131112

2014-08-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20140731

2014-07-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131112

2013-03-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20121217

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20121122

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20121124

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-04-22 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20090422

2009-04-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2009-01-14 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: CONTINENTAL AUTOMOTIVE GMBH

- Effective date: 20040527

2008-04-02 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: SIEMENS VDO AUTOMOTIVE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Effective date: 20040527

2004-07-28 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SIEMENS AGCT IP SV

- Effective date: 20040527

2004-06-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-01-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031223

2003-10-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59809494

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20031009

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-09-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-09-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020724

2000-02-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991210

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT