Global patent index - EP 0970325 A1

EP 0970325 A1 2000-01-12 - SINGLE INNER CONE BLOWPIPE, WITH FLOW RATE PREMIX MORE THAN 1000 LITRES/HOUR

Title (en)

SINGLE INNER CONE BLOWPIPE, WITH FLOW RATE PREMIX MORE THAN 1000 LITRES/HOUR

Title (de)

BRENNER, WIE EINE LANZE MIT EINZELSTICHFLAMME DIE EINE VORMISCHDURCHFLUSSMENGE VON MEHR ALS 1000 LITER/STUNDE AUFWEIST

Title (fr)

BRULEUR, TEL UN CHALUMEAU MONODARD, A PREMELANGE DE DEBIT SUPERIEUR A 1000 LITRES/HEURE

Publication

EP 0970325 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98914950 A

Priority

  • FR 9800553 W
  • FR 9703879 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2761457A1] The invention concerns a burner, in particular a single inner cone blowpipe, with flow rate premix more than 1000 l/h comprising a duct (14) supplying gas mixture having an end supplying (32) gas mixture and a single nozzle (16) for producing the flame mounted at the other end. The supply duct (14) is adapted such that, at any point of at least a transverse section thereof, the Reynolds number circulating in the supply duct (14) is less than 3000, when the burner, for example the blowpipe, operates in steady state condition at a flow rate higher than 1000 l/h. The blowpipe is useful for soldering, straightening, preheating before welding, heat forming or thermal treatment.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23D 14/38; F23D 14/08; F23D 14/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23D 14/08 (2006.01); F23D 14/38 (2006.01); F23D 14/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23D 14/38 (2013.01); F23D 14/08 (2013.01); F23D 14/46 (2013.01); F23D 2210/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9844296A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2761457 A1 19981002; FR 2761457 B1 19990514; AU 6925498 A 19981022; DE 69802273 D1 20011206; DE 69802273 T2 20020711; EP 0970325 A1 20000112; EP 0970325 B1 20011031; ES 2167071 T3 20020501; WO 9844296 A1 19981008

INPADOC legal status

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080319

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2009-02-27 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081001

2008-12-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20081125

2008-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *LA SOUDURE AUTOGENE FRANCAISE

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070212

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-02 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20070308

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070607

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-03-08 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20070308

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-02-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070226

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060331

- Year of fee payment: 09

2006-02-09 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060209

- Year of fee payment: 09

2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20030410

2002-11-06 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020319

2002-10-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2167071

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2002-03-20 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020320

2002-03-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020319

2002-02-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020115

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-12-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 69802273

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20011206

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2001-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

2001-05-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010412

2001-04-04 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free Format Text: PREMIX BURNER WITH A FLOW RATE OF MORE THAN 1000 LITRES/HOUR

2000-01-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991028

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT