Global Patent Index - EP 0970327 A1

EP 0970327 A1 2000-01-12 - A BOILER FITTED WITH A BURNER

Title (en)

A BOILER FITTED WITH A BURNER

Title (de)

MIT EINEM BRENNER AUSGERÜSTETER HEIZKESSEL

Title (fr)

CHAUDIERE DE CHAUFFAGE EQUIPEE D'UN BRULEUR

Publication

EP 0970327 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98907799 A

Priority

  • CH 9800112 W
  • CH 71897 A
  • CH 71997 A
  • CH 72097 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9843019A1] This invention concerns a boiler (11) fitted with a burner suitable for wall heaters or built-in kitchen heaters in which a mantle-shaped heat exchanger (15) made of pipe elements (43) connected in parallel and/or series divides the boiler chamber into a combustion chamber (17) and an exhaust chamber (19). The heat exchanger (15) has openings (41) for hot flue gases distributed over its mantle. The burner head disposed in the combustion chamber is suitable for burning oil and has a flame tube (23) with an axial flame opening (37) and a flame baffle element (39) disposed at a distance from the flame opening (37) which is constructed so that the flame is diverted into the space between the flame tube (23) and the heat exchanger (15). In addition, a fire chamber mantle can be disposed between the heat exchanger (15) and the flame tube (23) to protect the heat exchanger (15) from direct contact with the flame.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23M 9/06; F23C 9/00; F23D 11/40; F23D 17/00; F24H 1/43

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23C 9/00 (2006.01); F23C 9/08 (2006.01); F23D 11/40 (2006.01); F23D 14/36 (2006.01); F23D 14/82 (2006.01); F23D 17/00 (2006.01); F23M 9/06 (2006.01); F24H 1/43 (2006.01); F24H 1/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24H 1/43 (2013.01); F23C 9/006 (2013.01); F23C 9/08 (2013.01); F23D 11/40 (2013.01); F23D 14/36 (2013.01); F23D 14/82 (2013.01); F23D 17/002 (2013.01); F23M 9/06 (2013.01); F23C 2202/10 (2013.01); F23C 2202/20 (2013.01); F23C 2900/03006 (2013.01); F23C 2900/09002 (2013.01); F23D 2207/00 (2013.01); F23D 2209/20 (2013.01); F23D 2210/00 (2013.01); F23D 2900/11402 (2013.01); F23D 2900/11403 (2013.01); F24H 1/263 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9843019A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9843019 A1 19981001; AT 210266 T 20011215; AU 6606498 A 19981020; CA 2284706 A1 19981001; DE 59802337 D1 20020117; EP 0970327 A1 20000112; EP 0970327 B1 20011205; US 2001031440 A1 20011018; US 6305331 B1 20011023; US 6579086 B2 20030617

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-08-07 [REG DE R039] REVOCATION ACTION FILED

- Document: DE 59802337

- Effective date: 20140429

2014-08-07 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SWISS E-TECHNIC AG, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SWISS E-TECHNIC AG, MASTRILS, CH

- Document: DE 59802337

- Effective date: 20140626

2014-08-07 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59802337

- Representative's name: KOHLER SCHMID MOEBUS PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20140626

2014-08-07 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59802337

- Representative's name: KOHLER SCHMID MOEBUS PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCH, DE

- Effective date: 20140626

2014-04-29 [REG DE R008] CASE PENDING AT FEDERAL PATENT COURT

- Document: DE 59802337

2014-03-15 [REG AT NFJG] REINSTATEMENT AFTER LATE PAYMENT OF ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 210266 T

- Effective date: 20140205

2014-03-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: SWISS E-TECHNIC AG, CH

- Document: AT 210266 T

- Effective date: 20140205

2013-09-05 [REG DE R074] RE-ESTABLISHMENT ALLOWED

- Document: DE 59802337

- Effective date: 20130711

2013-09-05 [REG DE R074] RE-ESTABLISHMENT ALLOWED

- Document: DE 59802337

- Effective date: 20130714

2013-07-31 [PGRI AT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Effective date: 20130620

2013-06-21 [REG DE R073] RE-ESTABLISHMENT REQUESTED

- Document: DE 59802337

2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120323

2013-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120331

2013-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120331

2013-01-31 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59802337

- Effective date: 20121002

2012-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 210266 T

- Effective date: 20120323

2012-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2012-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110930

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-02-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ROSENICH PAUL; GISLER CHRISTIAN PATENTBUERO PAUL R

2007-02-28 [REG CH PK] CORRECTION

- Free text: DIE LOESCHUNG DES VERTRETEREINTRAGS FUER DEN GESETZLICHEN VERTRETER ERFOLGTE IRRTUEMLICH.

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-10-18 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2002-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *VTH VERFAHRENTECHNIK FUR HEIZUNG A.G.

- Effective date: 20020331

2002-07-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTBUERO PAUL ROSENICH AG

2002-07-24 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2002-06-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020627

2002-06-05 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20011205

2002-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020331

2002-03-23 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020323

2002-03-05 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020305

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59802337 20020117

2002-01-09 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU SE

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 19991011;LT PAYMENT 19991011;LV PAYMENT 19991011;RO PAYMENT 19991011;SI PAYMENT 19991011

2001-12-05 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011205

2001-12-05 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011205

2001-12-05 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011205

2001-12-05 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011205

2001-12-05 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011205

2001-12-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 210266 T 20011215

2000-07-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000613

2000-01-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991011

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU SE

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 19991011;LT PAYMENT 19991011;LV PAYMENT 19991011;RO PAYMENT 19991011;SI PAYMENT 19991011