Global patent index - EP 0970329 A1

EP 0970329 A1 2000-01-12 - PLATED PROJECTILE FOR USE IN SUBSONIC AMMUNITION

Title (en)

PLATED PROJECTILE FOR USE IN SUBSONIC AMMUNITION

Title (de)

MANTELGESCHOSS FÜR EINE SUBSONISCHE MUNITION

Title (fr)

PROJECTILE PLAQUE SERVANT DE MUNITION SUBSONIQUE

Publication

EP 0970329 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98922015 A

Priority

  • US 9804998 W
  • US 81500397 A
  • US 88827097 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9840675A1] A projectile (18) for use in ammunition for a small-bore weapon which is operated in the semi-automatic or automatic mode and which is fired subsonically and without generating of audible sound during free flight of the projectile through air. The projectile, in one embodiment, comprises a tungsten/lead powder-based core (14) having a light metal plate (20) applied to the exterior surface thereof. A round of ammunition (24) incorporating the projectile (18) is disclosed which produces subsonic velocity of the projectile during flight and sufficient energy to consistently operate the bolt mechanism of the weapon. A method for the manufacture of the projectile is disclosed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24B 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42B 12/74 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42B 12/74 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] DE 3131265 C1
  • [A] "Gesamtjahres Katalog 88/89" , FRANKONIA , WÜRZBURG 88/89 XP002143604 * page 204; table 1 *
  • See also references of WO 9840675A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9840675 A1 19980917; CA 2283839 A1 19980917; EP 0970329 A1 20000112; EP 0970329 A4 20000927

INPADOC legal status

2004-04-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031022

2003-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: DORIS NEBEL BEAL INTER VIVOS PATENT TRUST

2002-09-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020801

2000-09-27 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000810

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free Format Text: 7F 24B 5/00 A, 7F 42B 12/74 B

2000-01-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991012

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE