Global patent index - EP 0970350 A1

EP 0970350 A1 2000-01-12 - IMPULSE FLUID JET APPARATUS WITH DEPRIMING PROTECTION

Title (en)

IMPULSE FLUID JET APPARATUS WITH DEPRIMING PROTECTION

Title (de)

IMPULSTINTENSTRAHLGERÄT MIT UNTERDRUCKSCHUTZ

Title (fr)

APPAREIL A JET DE FLUIDE A IMPULSION AVEC PROTECTION CONTRE LA DEPRESSION

Publication

EP 0970350 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98911836 A

Priority

  • US 9805420 W
  • US 82875897 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9843050A1] An impulse ink jet print head (10) including a compliant chamber (49) coupled between an ink supply (72) and an ink chamber (48). The print head also includes a check valve (32). The compliant chamber (49) attenuates pressure disturbances of short duration. The check valve (32) prevents the reverse flow of ink.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01D 15/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01D 15/18 (2006.01); B41J 2/055 (2006.01); B41J 2/14 (2006.01); B41J 2/175 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/17509 (2013.01); B41J 2/055 (2013.01); B41J 2/14 (2013.01); B41J 2/175 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] US 4575738 A
  • [X] DE 3209947 C1
  • [X] US 4528578 A
  • [A] DE 2311383 B1
  • [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 006, no. 263 (M-181), 22 December 1982 (1982-12-22) & JP 57 156262 A (SANYO DENKI KK), 27 September 1982 (1982-09-27)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 014, no. 010 (M-917), 10 January 1990 (1990-01-10) & JP 01 257058 A (SEIKO EPSON CORP), 13 October 1989 (1989-10-13)
  • See also references of WO 9843050A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FI FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9843050 A1 19981001; AU 6570098 A 19981020; AU 741027 B2 20011122; CA 2283666 A1 19981001; CA 2283666 C 20060815; DE 69830481 D1 20050714; DE 69830481 T2 20051103; EP 0970350 A1 20000112; EP 0970350 A4 20010307; EP 0970350 B1 20050608; ES 2242998 T3 20051116; IL 131910 D0 20010319; JP 2001519039 A 20011016; NO 994644 A 19990924; NO 994644 D0 19990924

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160323

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160331

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160328

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160329

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160328

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-03-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150317

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150327

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150327

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150326

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150324

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-03-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-03-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110321

2011-11-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110320

2011-11-01 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2010-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20100329

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-05-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20100330

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-12-13 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2006-05-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060309

2006-04-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-03-20 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060320

2005-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2005-12-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT; NO LEGAL EFFECT FROM

2005-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2242998

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2005-07-27 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2005-07-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 69830481

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20050714

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-06-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2005-06-14 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2005-06-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FI FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

2005-06-08 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050608

2005-06-08 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050608

2005-06-08 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050608

2005-06-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2005-05-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS INC.

2003-05-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030409

2001-03-07 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20010119

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FI FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

2001-03-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free Format Text: 7B 41J 2/055 A, 7B 41J 2/045 B

2000-01-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991006

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FI FR GB IE IT LI NL SE