Global Patent Index - EP 0970406 A1

EP 0970406 A1 2000-01-12 - PRINTING OR COPYING APPLIANCE WITH EXCHANGEABLE PART UNITS WHICH HAVE AN IDENTIFICATION DEVICE, METHOD FOR OPERATING AN APPLIANCE OF THIS TYPE AND TONER CONTAINERS FOR USE IN THE SAME

Title (en)

PRINTING OR COPYING APPLIANCE WITH EXCHANGEABLE PART UNITS WHICH HAVE AN IDENTIFICATION DEVICE, METHOD FOR OPERATING AN APPLIANCE OF THIS TYPE AND TONER CONTAINERS FOR USE IN THE SAME

Title (de)

DRUCK- ODER KOPIERGERÄT MIT EINE IDENTIFIZIERUNGSANORDNUNG AUFWEISENDEN AUSTAUSCHBAREN TEILAGGREGATEN, VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB EINES SOLCHEN GERÄTS SOWIE TONERSEHÄLTER ZUR VERWENDUNG IN EINEM SOLCHEN GERÄT

Title (fr)

APPAREIL D'IMPRESSION OU DE COPIE COMPORTANT DES UNITES PARTIELLES INTERCHANGEABLES PRESENTANT UN DISPOSITIF D'IDENTIFICATION, PROCEDE DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN TEL APPAREIL ET CARTOUCHE DE TONER POUR L'UTILISATION DUDIT APPAREIL

Publication

EP 0970406 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98912199 A

Priority

  • DE 9800355 W
  • DE 19712798 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9843136A1] The invention relates to a printing or copying appliance which has one or several exchangeable part units (14) with a modular assembly. The part unit (14) to be identified has an identification device (30) with a non-volatile memory (43) for storing function-relevant operating data of said part unit (14), said operating data being allocated to operating states. Said part unit (14) also has a communication interface (38, 39) for detachably connecting said identification device (30) to a process control device (40) of the appliance.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03G 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03G 21/00 (2006.01); G03G 15/00 (2006.01); G03G 15/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03G 15/553 (2013.01); G03G 15/55 (2013.01); B41J 2202/17 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9843136A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9843136 A1 19981001; CA 2284928 A1 19981001; CA 2284928 C 20060404; DE 19880371 D2 20000531; DE 29823854 U1 20000330; EP 0970406 A1 20000112; EP 0970406 B1 20011010; EP 0970406 B2 20150610; EP 1016935 A2 20000705; EP 1016935 A3 20001018; EP 1016935 B1 20020508; JP 2001519055 A 20011016; JP 2010160524 A 20100722; JP 4541456 B2 20100908; US 6181885 B1 20010130

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160324

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-06-10 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20150610

2015-06-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB

2015-06-10 [REG DE R102] EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT IN AMENDED FORM NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 59801690

2015-05-03 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59801690

- Representative's name: SCHAUMBURG & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE GBR, DE

2015-05-03 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59801690

- Representative's name: SCHAUMBURG & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE MBB, DE

2015-05-03 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59801690

- Representative's name: SCHAUMBURG UND PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE MBB, DE

2014-10-01 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20140904 AND 20140910

2014-06-13 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: OCE PRINTING SYSTEMS GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Effective date: 20140513

2013-10-10 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: OCE PRINTING SYSTEMS GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: OCE PRINTING SYSTEMS GMBH, 85586 POING, DE

- Document: DE 59801690

- Effective date: 20130820

2013-10-10 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59801690

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAUMBURG, THOENES, THURN, LAN, DE

- Effective date: 20130820

2013-10-10 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59801690

- Representative's name: SCHAUMBURG & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE GBR, DE

- Effective date: 20130820

2013-10-10 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59801690

- Representative's name: SCHAUMBURG & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE MBB, DE

- Effective date: 20130820

2013-10-10 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59801690

- Representative's name: SCHAUMBURG UND PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE MBB, DE

- Effective date: 20130820

2013-08-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59801690

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAUMBURG, THOENES, THURN, LAN, DE

2010-02-26 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090228

2009-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *OCE PRINTING SYSTEMS G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20090228

2008-08-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20080326

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-09-04 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: XEROX CORPORATION

- Effective date: 20020704

2002-09-04 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: CANON INC.

- Effective date: 20020710

2002-08-28 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: XEROX CORPORATION

- Effective date: 20020704

2002-02-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20011221

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59801690 20011115

2001-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB

2001-03-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010118

2000-12-27 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PRINTING OR COPYING APPLIANCE WITH EXCHANGEABLE PART UNITS WHICH HAVE AN IDENTIFICATION DEVICE, METHOD FOR OPERATING SUCH AN APPLIANCE AND A TONER CONTAINER FOR USE IN SUCH APPLIANCE

2000-09-27 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PRINTING OR COPYING APPLIANCE WITH EXCHANGEBALE PART UNITS WHICH HAVE AN IDENTIFICATION DEVICE, METHOD FOR OPERATING SUCH AN APPLIANCE AND A TONER CONTAINER FOR USE IN SUCH APPLIANCE

2000-03-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BEST, ARNO

2000-03-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: RADEMACHER, VOLKER

2000-03-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHMIDT-HOENOW, CHRISTIAN

2000-03-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ZIETLOW, KURT

2000-03-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WARBUS, VOLKER

2000-03-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LAY, HEINRICH

2000-03-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHEIDIG, KAROLA

2000-01-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991020

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB