Global Patent Index - EP 0970443 A1

EP 0970443 A1 2000-01-12 - KEY CABINET FOR EQUIPPING AN ACCESS CONTROL SYSTEM, AND METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR CONTROLLING ACCESS USING THIS KEY CABINET

Title (en)

KEY CABINET FOR EQUIPPING AN ACCESS CONTROL SYSTEM, AND METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR CONTROLLING ACCESS USING THIS KEY CABINET

Title (de)

SCHLÜSSELSCHRANK ZUM BESTÜCKEN EINES ZUGANGSKONTROLLSYSTEMS UND VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM MIT DIESEM SCHLÜSSELSCHRANK

Title (fr)

ARMOIRE A CLES POUR EQUIPER UN SYSTEME DE CONTROLE D'ACCES, ET PROCEDE ET SYSTEME DE CONTROLE D'ACCES METTANT EN OEUVRE CETTE ARMOIRE A CLES

Publication

EP 0970443 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98913832 A

Priority

  • FR 9800431 W
  • FR 9702599 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2760557A1] The invention concerns a key cabinet (AC1) for equipping an access control system (1) comprising a plurality of devices for reading data associated with personal identification means (EI), means for managing access control including in particular decision making means for controlling access and means for preserving a trace of events which have occurred on this system, said cabinet (AC1) comprising means adapted (Ci, j) for receiving a set of keys (CL) and means (TL) for controlling access to these receiver means. Said cabinet (AC1) is connected to an access control system (1) by being inserted between a reading device and its controller. It further comprises means (CE1) for generating a virtual badge corresponding to any status change, said virtual badge being then transferred to the decision making means (SD). The invention is particularly applicable for equipping existing access control systems with a key cabinet.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07C 11/00; G07F 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 19/00 (2006.01); G07C 11/00 (2006.01); G07F 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07C 9/00896 (2013.01); E05B 19/0005 (2013.01); G07F 17/0042 (2013.01); G07C 2009/00936 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9839741A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

FR 2760557 A1 19980911; FR 2760557 B1 19990521; AU 6838798 A 19980922; CA 2283153 A1 19980911; CA 2283153 C 20070522; DE 69803167 D1 20020221; DE 69803167 T2 20020718; EP 0970443 A1 20000112; EP 0970443 B1 20020116; ES 2169508 T3 20020701; WO 9839741 A1 19980911

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160324

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160330

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160316

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160309

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160323

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-08-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69803167

- Representative's name: GRAMM, LINS & PARTNER PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAEL, DE

2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020331

2004-01-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-11-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031127

2003-01-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2169508 T3

2002-05-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020406

2002-03-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ABREMA AGENCE BREVETS ET MARQUES GANGUILLET & HUMP

2002-02-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69803167 20020221

2002-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-01-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LENGLART, PASCAL

2001-08-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DE RASSE, CHRISTOPHE

2001-04-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010307

2000-01-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990930

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI