Global Patent Index - EP 0970452 A1

EP 0970452 A1 2000-01-12 - DATA AND VALUE UNIT TRANSFER SYSTEM ON SLOT MACHINE NETWORK

Title (en)

DATA AND VALUE UNIT TRANSFER SYSTEM ON SLOT MACHINE NETWORK

Title (de)

SYSTEM ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG VON DATEN UND WERTEINHEITEN IN EINEM NETZ VON SPIELAUTOMATEN

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE TRANSFERT DE DONNEES ET D'UNITES DE VALEUR SUR UN RESEAU DE MACHINES A SOUS

Publication

EP 0970452 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98917213 A

Priority

  • FR 9800583 W
  • FR 9704734 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2762119A1] The invention concerns data transfer in a network of slot machines (200, 201, 202) equipped with means for transferring value units (300, 301, 302) and communicating by data transfer connection (123) with a central management unit (1). The invention is characterised in that it consists of a device (400) for transferring data comprising a multi-channel connection, a first channel (410) being allocated the network data transfer connection (123) with the central management unit (1), a second channel (420) being assigned to a slot machine (200), a third channel (430) being assigned to a value unit transfer device, and the device comprises data transfer switching means, for operating main data transmissions between two main channels (410, 420) and for operating secondary transmissions between a main channel (420) and a secondary channel (430).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07F 17/32; G07F 9/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63F 5/04 (2006.01); G07F 7/08 (2006.01); G07F 9/08 (2006.01); G07F 17/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 17/32 (2013.01); G07F 9/08 (2013.01); G07F 17/3281 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9847114A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2762119 A1 19981016; FR 2762119 B1 19990709; AT 208519 T 20011115; AU 7050298 A 19981111; AU 737978 B2 20010906; CA 2258150 A1 19981022; CN 1228180 A 19990908; DE 69802390 D1 20011213; DE 69802390 T2 20020718; EP 0970452 A1 20000112; EP 0970452 B1 20011107; ES 2167887 T3 20020516; JP 2001501124 A 20010130; US 6589119 B1 20030708; WO 9847114 A1 19981022

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070320

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060223

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070321

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070402

2008-06-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20070321

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070320

2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071002

2008-01-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20071130

2007-11-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070320

2006-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060331

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-03-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060329

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-02-27 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060227

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-03-08 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050308

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-10-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *GEMPLUS

- Effective date: 20020331

2002-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2167887 T3

2002-04-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020331

2002-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020331

2002-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020331

2002-03-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020208

2002-02-07 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020207

2002-02-07 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020207

2002-02-07 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020207

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69802390 20011213

2001-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-11-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

2001-11-07 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011107

2001-11-07 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011107

2001-11-07 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011107

2001-11-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 208519 T 20011115

2001-07-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010607

2000-01-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990422

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE