Global patent index - EP 0970457 A1

EP 0970457 A1 2000-01-12 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR DETECTING SNOW AND ICE

Title (en)

DEVICE AND METHOD FOR DETECTING SNOW AND ICE

Title (de)

EINRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR SCHNEE- UND EISMELDUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE DESTINE A LA SIGNALISATION DE NEIGE ET DE GLACE

Publication

EP 0970457 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98912386 A

Priority

  • DE 19711371 A
  • EP 9801055 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19711371C1] The invention relates to a device for detecting snow and ice which has a sensor arrangement (11) comprising a humidity sensor (13) and an ambient temperature sensor (12). An evaluator switch is controlled according to a humidity sensor- measured variable, producing a control signal at set humidity values for defrosting a surface which is being monitored for snow and ice. The ambient temperature sensor (12) activates the humidity sensor (13) within a temperature range of between +2 DEG C and -12 DEG C. The humidity sensor (13) itself has a PTC heating element, the current consumption of said heating element being used as a measure of humidity. Both the ambient temperature sensor (12) and the humidity sensor (13) are positioned at a mutual distance in a longitudinally extended sensor cartridge (14) made of plastic. The temperature sensor (12) is thermally decoupled from the PTC heating element. The PTC heating element is built into a metal sleeve in such a way that it is corrosion and humidity proof.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08B 19/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08B 19/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08B 19/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9841958A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19711371 C1 19980827; AT 217110 T 20020515; CA 2284258 A1 19980924; CA 2284258 C 20080408; DE 29717945 U1 19980820; DK 0970457 T3 20020826; EP 0970457 A1 20000112; EP 0970457 B1 20020502; US 6276202 B1 20010821; WO 9841958 A1 19980924

INPADOC legal status

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140902

2014-12-04 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59803984

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140902

2014-09-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59803984

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110226

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130228

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-11-22 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59803984

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Owner name: TEKMAR REGELSYSTEME GMBH, DE

- Free Format Text: FORMER OWNER: TEKMAR GMBH, 45257 ESSEN, DE

- Effective date: 20121001

2012-11-22 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59803984

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: ZENZ PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20121001

2012-10-01 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59803984

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: ZENZ PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE GBR, DE

2012-09-28 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100225

2011-10-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100225

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100225

2011-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100228

2011-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100228

2011-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100301

2011-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100901

2010-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100225

2010-11-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20101029

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100228

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100228

2010-10-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100225

2010-10-04 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2010-09-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2010-09-15 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20100901

2010-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *TEKMAR G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20100228

2010-01-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20091229

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090220

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20090430

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090221

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-06-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090316

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090325

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-05-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20090224

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-04-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090224

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20090219

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-04-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20090303

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-04-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030204

2002-10-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-08-26 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2002-08-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020720

2002-06-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59803984

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20020606

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2002-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-05-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

2002-05-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 217110

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 20020515

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-10-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: TEKMAR GMBH

2001-10-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010829

2000-01-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990929

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR GB IT LI LU NL SE