Global Patent Index - EP 0970458 B1

EP 0970458 B1 2002-11-27 - WALK-TEST CONTROL CIRCUIT FOR SECURITY ALARM DEVICE

Title (en)

WALK-TEST CONTROL CIRCUIT FOR SECURITY ALARM DEVICE

Title (de)

LAUFTEST-STEUERUNGSSCHALTUNG FÜR SICHERHEITSALARMVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

CIRCUIT DE COMMANDE DES ESSAIS DE MARCHE POUR DISPOSITIF D'ALARME DE SECURITE

Publication

EP 0970458 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 98913463 A

Priority

  • CA 9800259 W
  • CA 2200994 A

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08B 29/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08B 29/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08B 29/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

AU 6815898 A 19981020; AU 736177 B2 20010726; DE 69809724 D1 20030109; DE 69809724 T2 20030731; EP 0970458 A1 20000112; EP 0970458 B1 20021127

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170329

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170324

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170327

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170327

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-03-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-03-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2009-10-09 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2003-11-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-07-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-01-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69809724 20030109

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-11-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-02-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001227

2000-01-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990925

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT