Global Patent Index - EP 0970484 A1

EP 0970484 A1 2000-01-12 - MINERAL INSULATED CABLE

Title (en)

MINERAL INSULATED CABLE

Title (de)

MINERALISOLIERTES KABEL

Title (fr)

CABLE A ISOLANT MINERAL

Publication

EP 0970484 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98910830 A

Priority

  • GB 9800665 W
  • GB 9706257 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9843254A1] A method of manufacturing mineral insulated cable comprises transporting a strip (1) of metal and one or more elongate conductors (4) along their length, continuously forming the strip into a tube that encloses the or each conductor, and welding opposed longitudinally extending edges of the strip together. Mineral insulant is inserted into the tube to form a cable preform, and the cable preform is subjected to one or more reduction operations in which its diameter is reduced to form the cable. The mineral insulant comprises amorphous silica that contains from 0.01 to 30 % by weight of a binder that causes the silica to resist deformation of the tube when the tube is subjected to the reduction operations. Preferred binders include mullite in the range of about 13 to 20 % by weight, and lime in the range of from 1 to 20 % by weight.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01B 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01B 13/004 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01B 13/004 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9843254A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9843254 A1 19981001; AU 6506298 A 19981020; EP 0970484 A1 20000112; EP 0970484 B1 20030723; GB 9706257 D0 19970514

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160306

2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160306

2017-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160331

2016-12-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20161130

2016-11-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160306

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150327

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150317

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150324

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-03-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2006-10-13 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1026978

2004-07-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040426

2004-04-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-07-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT

2003-07-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-06-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TYCO THERMAL CONTROLS UK LIMITED

2002-05-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BICC GENERAL PYROTENAX CABLES LIMITED

2000-01-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990806

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT