Global Patent Index - EP 0970498 A1

EP 0970498 A1 2000-01-12 - COMPRESSED GAS POWER SWITCH

Title (en)

COMPRESSED GAS POWER SWITCH

Title (de)

DRUCKGASLEISTUNGSSCHALTER

Title (fr)

DISJONCTEUR A GAZ COMPRIME

Publication

EP 0970498 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98928103 A

Priority

  • DE 9800921 W
  • DE 29706202 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9843265A1] The invention relates to a compressed gas power switch having a first actuatable electric arc contact (2), a second stationary electric arc contact (3), a rated current pathway (4) and a compression device (9). At least the first actuatable electric arc contact (2) is supported by a switching tube. The discharge volume (16) at the exit (15) of the switching tube (16) is connected to the low pressure chamber (18) by blow-out openings (17) and is separated from a suction area (23) by a wall (26).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 33/91

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 33/88 (2006.01); H01H 33/915 (2006.01); H01H 33/90 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 33/88 (2013.01); H01H 33/901 (2013.01); H01H 2033/888 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9843265A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29706202 U1 19970605; CN 1085399 C 20020522; CN 1255231 A 20000531; EP 0970498 A1 20000112; EP 0970498 B1 20020605; US 6207917 B1 20010327; WO 9843265 A1 19981001

INPADOC legal status


2018-03-27 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59804330

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170519

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170329

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170316

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-03-16 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-03-11 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111001

2005-11-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050327

2005-03-27 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050327

2004-03-04 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040304

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-05-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030306

2002-10-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-08-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020721

2002-07-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59804330 20020711

2002-06-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-06-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-09-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010719

2000-01-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990922

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT