Global patent index - EP 0970591 A1

EP 0970591 A1 2000-01-12 - GLASS FIBRE COATING COMPOSITION, METHOD USING SAID COMPOSITION AND RESULTING PRODUCT

Title (en)

GLASS FIBRE COATING COMPOSITION, METHOD USING SAID COMPOSITION AND RESULTING PRODUCT

Title (de)

ELEKTRISCHE KOMPONENTE MIT EINEM DURCH SIEBDRUCKVERFAHREN AUF EINE KERAMISCHE PLATTE AUFGEBRACHTE WIDERSTANDS- UND/ODER LEITERBAHN

Title (fr)

COMPOSANT ELECTRIQUE COMPRENANT UNE PLAQUETTE EN CERAMIQUE PORTANT UNE PISTE RESISTIVE ET/OU CONDUCTRICE SERIGRAPHIEE

Publication

EP 0970591 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98959993 A

Priority

  • FR 9802737 W
  • FR 9800944 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2774252A1] The component (1) comprises a ceramic insulating plate (2) with a screen-printed resistance and/or conducting track on one face, while its other face is in contact with a metal plate (3) which is heated or used for temperature measurement. One end of the track is metallized and soldered to a conductor wire (6), and the ceramic plate is completely enclosed by a metal cover (8) which has its edges sealed to the metal plate by a resin material. The space between the surface of the ceramic plate carrying the track and the inside of the cover is at least partially filled with a resin (11).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 3/30; H01R 43/02; H05B 3/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 75/24 (2006.01); D06F 75/26 (2006.01); H01R 43/02 (2006.01); H05B 3/04 (2006.01); H05B 3/08 (2006.01); H05B 3/26 (2006.01); H05B 3/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 75/24 (2013.01); D06F 75/26 (2013.01); H01R 43/0207 (2013.01); H05B 3/04 (2013.01); H05B 3/08 (2013.01); H05B 3/265 (2013.01); H05B 3/30 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9938359A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

FR 2774252 A1 19990730; FR 2774252 B1 20000324; AU 1568799 A 19990809; BR 9808035 A 20000308; CA 2283714 A1 19990729; CN 1251252 A 20000419; EP 0970591 A1 20000112; TR 9902318 T1 20000721; US 6144014 A 20001107; WO 9938359 A1 19990729

INPADOC legal status

2002-07-10 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20020211

2001-09-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010813

2001-08-22 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free Format Text: ELECTRICAL COMPONENT COMPRISING A CERAMIC BOARD WITH A RESISTIVE AND/OR CONDUCTIVE TRACK SCREEN PRINTED ON IT

2001-08-16 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free Format Text: ELECTRICAL COMPONENT COMPRISING A CERAMIC BOARD WITH A RESISTIVE AND/OR CONDUCTIVE TRACK SCREEN PRINTED ON IT

2000-01-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990906

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL