Global patent index - EP 0970625 A1

EP 0970625 A1 2000-01-12 - REGULATOR FOR SMOKING FLAVOR OF TOBACCO

Title (en)

REGULATOR FOR SMOKING FLAVOR OF TOBACCO

Title (de)

REGULIERER FÜR TABAKRAUCHAROMA

Title (fr)

REGULATEUR DE L'AROME DE LA FUMEE DU TABAC

Publication

EP 0970625 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98943041 A

Priority

  • JP 9804210 W
  • JP 25653797 A

Abstract (en)

Herbs or citrus are added to a tobacco flavoring agent containing ascorbic acid, a salt or isomer thereof, and a chlorophyll-containing material, thereby lowering the tar or nicotine content of tobacco smoke, softening the nicotine smell and unpleasant or irritating odors produced during smoking, and endowing the tobacco with an original flavor. This tobacco flavoring agent may be used by being deposited on the tips of cigarettes or other tobacco products, or by being mixed with shredded tobacco leaves.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A24B 15/30; A24B 15/32; A24B 15/38; A24B 15/42; A24D 1/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A24B 15/30 (2006.01); A24B 15/42 (2006.01); A24D 3/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A24B 15/302 (2013.01); A24B 15/30 (2013.01); A24B 15/42 (2013.01); A24D 3/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] US 4620554 A
  • [Y] DE 4136405 A1
  • [X] CA 1192108 A
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 0152, no. 11 (C-0836), 29 May 1991 (1991-05-29) & JP 03 061471 A (OSHIRO KK), 18 March 1991 (1991-03-18)
  • [X] DATABASE WPI Week 199624 Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; AN 1996-231211 XP002159978 & CN 1 096 184 A (YU WANG), 14 December 1994 (1994-12-14)
  • [X] DATABASE WPI Week 199716 Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; AN 1997-166180 XP002159979 & CN 1 092 311 A (YAN WANG), 21 September 1994 (1994-09-21)
  • [X] DATABASE WPI Week 199735 Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; AN 1997-373421 XP002159980 & CN 1 110 115 A (JIFA HUANG)
  • See also references of WO 9915034A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0970625 A1 20000112; EP 0970625 A4 20010801; BR 9806241 A 20000328; CN 1131675 C 20031224; CN 1236306 A 19991124; EP 1421861 A2 20040526; EP 1421861 A3 20040616; EP 1421861 B1 20140702; HK 1023919 A1 20040924; WO 9915034 A1 19990401

INPADOC legal status

2004-10-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040227

2003-12-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031016

2001-08-01 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20010619

2001-08-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-04-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free Format Text: 7A 24B 15/30 A, 7A 24B 15/32 B, 7A 24B 15/38 B, 7A 24B 15/42 B, 7A 24D 1/18 B, 7A 24B 15/28 B

2000-01-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990824

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT