Global patent index - EP 0970626 A1

EP 0970626 A1 2000-01-12 - A plurality of wrappers filled with tobacco for making cigarettes

Title (en)

A plurality of wrappers filled with tobacco for making cigarettes

Title (de)

Eine zur Herstellung von Zigaretten bestimmte Vielzahl von mit Tabak gefüllten Stranghüllen

Title (fr)

Une pluralité d'enveloppes remplies de tabac pour la fabrication de cigarettes

Publication

EP 0970626 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99121159 A

Priority

  • DE 4344281 A
  • DE 4400192 A
  • EP 94120439 A

Abstract (en)

For hand-rolled cigarettes, a number of tobacco rolls (151) are wrapped in paper as filled cigarettes (150), and are assembled together in parallel. A packaging sheet (153) is placed over them on at least one side, of plastics or paper or cardboard, and they are gathered into a packaged unit.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine zur Herstellung von Zigaretten bestimmte Vielzahl von mit Tabak gefüllten Stranghüllen, bei der mindestens zwei, insbesondere mehrere, parallel nebeneinander angeordnete, jeweils mit Tabak gefüllte Stranhüllen (150) an wenigstens einer Seite durch eine Stranghüllenverbindung in Form eines Streifens aus Kunststoff, Papier oder Karton als Einheit zusammengehalten sind. Eine alternative Ausführungsform der Erfindung besteht darin, dag die mit Tabak gefüllten Stranghüllen innerhalb einer schlauchartigen Umverpackung plaziert sind. Eine noch andere Ausführungsform der Erfindung besteht darin, daß die mit Tabak gefüllten Stranghüllen (150) dicht aneinanderliegend angeordnet und längs ihrer Berührungslinien zu einer Einheit miteinander verklebt sind. Durch die genannten Maßnahmen wird die Handhabung von mit Tabak gefüllten Stranghüllen besonders in Verbindung mit einem System zum Füllen von Zigarettenpapierhülsen besonders vorteilhaft, da die zu einer Einheit verbundenen mit Tabak gefüllten Stranghüllen unter äußerer Abstützung unverschiebbar gehalten sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A24C 5/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A24C 5/40 (2006.01); A24C 5/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A24C 5/42 (2013.01); A24C 5/40 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GR IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 4400192 A1 19950629; DE 4400192 C2 19990128; EP 0970626 A1 20000112; EP 0970626 B1 20040211; US 5615692 A 19970401

INPADOC legal status

2014-12-23 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 59410354

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-03-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20131219

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131220

- Year of fee payment: 20

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040711

2005-09-30 [REG CH AUV] UNDELIVERABLE DECISIONS OPENED (PATENTS)

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: AUV

- Free Format Text: DAS OBGENANNTE PATENT IST, MANGELS BEZAHLUNG DER 11. JAHRESGEBUEHR DURCH VERFUEGUNG VOM 31. JULI 2005 ZURUECKGEWIESEN WORDEN. DIE VERFUEGUNG KONNTE DEM PATENTBEWERBER NICHT ZUGESTELLT WERDEN.

2005-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2005-02-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041112

2005-01-28 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041231

2004-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041231

2004-12-22 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041222

2004-12-22 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041222

2004-08-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT; NO LEGAL EFFECT FROM

2004-05-22 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040522

2004-05-11 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040511

2004-05-11 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040511

2004-05-11 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040511

2004-03-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59410354

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20040318

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-02-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-02-11 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Document Number: 0659352

- Country of Ref Document: EP

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GR IT LI LU NL PT SE

2004-02-11 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040211

2004-02-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040211

2004-02-11 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040211

2003-01-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021125

2000-09-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GR IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000707

2000-04-12 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: THE HOUSE OF EDGEWORTH INCORPORATED

2000-04-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: THE HOUSE OF HEDGEWORTH INCORPORATED

2000-01-12 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Document Number: 659352

- Country of Ref Document: EP

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GR IT LI LU NL PT SE