Global Patent Index - EP 0970630 A2

EP 0970630 A2 2000-01-12 - Shoe

Title (en)

Shoe

Title (de)

Schuh

Title (fr)

Chaussure

Publication

EP 0970630 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99113068 A

Priority

DE 19830334 A

Abstract (en)

The moccasin footwear has a separate flap section (3) over the instep, secured to the sole (1) by stretch strips (4) bonded to the flap (3) at one end (4a) with the other end (4b) attached to the sole (1). The flap section (3) can be moved on inserting the foot into the shoe to increase the length (b) of the shoe opening (5), which then returns to the normal opening length (a) when the foot is in the shoe.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Schuh mit einer Sohle 1, einem Blattschnitt-Schaft 2, einer Staublasche 3 sowie ein mit der Staublasche zusammenwirkendes Verschlußelement 4, wobei das Verschlußelement 4 längenvariabel ausgebildet ist und mit einen Ende 4a an der Staublasche 3 und mit dem anderen Ende 4b im Bereich der Sohle 1 befestigt ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A43B 23/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43B 23/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43B 23/26 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0970630 A2 20000112; EP 0970630 A3 20021030; DE 19830334 A1 20000113; US 6199305 B1 20010313

INPADOC legal status


2003-08-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2003-08-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030201

2003-07-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2002-10-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-10-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-10-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 43B 23/26 A

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI