Global Patent Index - EP 0970634 A1

EP 0970634 A1 2000-01-12 - Packaging and dispensing unit with an outer shell and an internal container and a method for mounting it

Title (en)

Packaging and dispensing unit with an outer shell and an internal container and a method for mounting it

Title (de)

Verpackungs- und Abgabeeinheite mit einer Aussenschale und einem Innenbehälter und Verfahren zur Montage

Title (fr)

Ensemble de conditionnement et de distribution du type a coque extérieure et récipient interne et procédé de montage

Publication

EP 0970634 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99401305 A

Priority

FR 9808557 A

Abstract (en)

A liquid packaging and dispensing unit (100) has a container (20) fixed in an outer shell (1) by fasteners (25, 26-29) which are engaged by pressure application and by tool insertion through shell side openings (40). A liquid packaging and dispensing unit (100) comprises an inner container (20), a dispensing device (11) engaging a container opening and an outer open-bottom rigid or semi-rigid shell (1) for accommodating the internal container. The shell has a top opening (15) for container communication with the exterior and has fasteners (26-29) for engaging complementary container fasteners (25) to fix the container within the shell when axial pressure is applied onto the shell and/or the container. The shell also has one or more side openings (40) extending towards its fasteners (26-29) to allow passage of a tool which causes engagement of the shell and container fasteners. An Independent claim is also included for a method of assembling the above unit.

Abstract (fr)

La présente demande concerne un ensemble (100) pour le conditionnement et la distribution d'un produit fluide comprenant un récipient interne (20), un moyen de distribution (11) destiné à venir en engagement sur une ouverture (24) du récipient, et une coque extérieure (1) dont le fond (7) est ouvert, ladite coque (1) étant destinée à recevoir ledit récipient, via ledit fond ouvert, et comportant des moyens d'accrochage (26-29) aptes à venir en engagement avec des moyens d'accrochage complémentaires (25) portés par le récipient (20), de manière à immobiliser le récipient (20) à l'intérieur de la coque. Selon l'invention, ladite coque extérieure (1) comporte au moins une ouverture latérale (40, 41) s'étendant au moins au voisinage des moyens d'accrochage (26-29) de manière à permettre le passage d'un outil participant à la mise en engagement des moyens d'accrochage (26-29) de la coque avec les moyens d'accrochage complémentaires (25) du récipient. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45D 34/00; B05B 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45D 34/00 (2006.01); B05B 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 11/3047 (2013.01); A45D 34/00 (2013.01); B05B 11/0037 (2013.01); B05B 11/0043 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0447687 A1 19910925 - PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0970634 A1 20000112; EP 0970634 B1 20030115; DE 69904884 D1 20030220; DE 69904884 T2 20030731; ES 2191400 T3 20030901; FR 2780621 A1 20000107; FR 2780621 B1 20000825

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040602

2005-06-01 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050601

2005-04-08 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-01-19 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2005-01-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050101

2004-06-02 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040602

2004-06-01 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040601

2004-01-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031016

2003-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2191400 T3

2003-06-19 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030619

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-06-12 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030612

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-06-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030610

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-06-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030509

2003-05-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030528

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-02-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69904884 P 20030220

2003-01-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-01-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-09-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000712

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI