Global patent index - EP 0970635 A1

EP 0970635 A1 2000-01-12 - Package for a stick shaped composition comprising a mechanism absorbing excess pressure

Title (en)

Package for a stick shaped composition comprising a mechanism absorbing excess pressure

Title (de)

Verpackung für eine stiftförmige Masse versehen mit einer einen Überdruck absorbierenden Einrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour le conditionnement d'un produit sous forme d'un raisin équipé d'un mécanisme d'absorption de surpression

Publication

EP 0970635 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99401454 A

Priority

FR 9808936 A

Abstract (en)

A stick packaging and dispensing device has an elastic insert (25) for relieving pressure produced within the dispenser sleeve (2) when fitting a closure (27, 28). A device (1) for packaging and dispensing a stick (12) in a cup (11) which is located above a seal (14) and which can be axially displaced between storage and application positions within a sleeve (2) which has an outlet opening (30) closed by a removable closure (27, 28). An elastic insert (25) is provided below the seal (14) so that excess pressure within the sleeve (2), especially occurring when fitting the closure (27, 28) onto the outlet opening (30), causes axial displacement of the cup (11) away from the outlet opening and thus relieves the excess pressure.

Abstract (fr)

La présente demande concerne un dispositif (1) pour le conditionnement et la distribution d'un produit sous forme d'un raisin (12) disposé dans une cupule (11), pouvant, en réponse à une commande d'actionnement, se déplacer axialement à l'intérieur d'une chemise (2) entre une position de stockage et une position d'application, un organe (14) assurant une étanchéité sous la cupule (11), ladite chemise (2) comportant un bord libre délimitant un orifice de sortie (30), obturé de manière étanche par un élément de fermeture amovible (27, 28). Selon l'invention, des moyens élastiques (25) sont prévus sous l'organe (14) pour, en cas de surpression à l'intérieur de la chemise (2), notamment lors du montage de l'élément de fermeture (27, 28) sur l'orifice de sortie (30), provoquer un déplacement axial de la cupule (11), dans la direction opposée audit orifice de sortie (30), et absorber ainsi au moins en partie ladite surpression. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45D 40/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45D 40/04 (2006.01); A45D 40/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A45D 40/10 (2013.01); A45D 40/04 (2013.01); A45D 2040/0062 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Citation (examination)

US 249172 A 18811108

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0970635 A1 20000112; EP 0970635 B1 20031008; CA 2277687 A1 20000110; CA 2277687 C 20031202; DE 69911855 D1 20031113; DE 69911855 T2 20040805; ES 2209352 T3 20040616; FR 2780865 A1 20000114; FR 2780865 B1 20000922; JP 2000060637 A 20000229; JP 3322306 B2 20020909; US 2001003564 A1 20010614; US 6340258 B2 20020122

INPADOC legal status

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070614

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2007-09-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20060615

2007-04-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20070228

2007-02-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060614

2007-01-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070103

2006-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060630

- Year of fee payment: 08

2006-06-15 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060615

2005-07-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050728

- Year of fee payment: 07

2005-06-09 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050609

- Year of fee payment: 07

2005-06-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050608

- Year of fee payment: 07

2005-06-08 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050608

- Year of fee payment: 07

2004-09-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040709

2004-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2209352

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-05-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040428

2003-11-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 69911855

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20031113

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-10-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-10-08 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031008

2003-10-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-10-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020822

2000-09-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000712

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI