Global Patent Index - EP 0970640 A1

EP 0970640 A1 2000-01-12 - Working-chair with backrest

Title (en)

Working-chair with backrest

Title (de)

Arbeitsstuhl mit Rückenlehne

Title (fr)

Chaise de travail avec dossier

Publication

EP 0970640 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98810641 A

Priority

EP 98810641 A

Abstract (en)

A clothes hanger (19) with two shoulder supports (21,23) is integrated into the rear of the chair backrest (11). The clothes hanger forms part of the back support section of the backrest, which is secured to a support frame. The clothes hanger is attached to the top edge of the back support section by a central vertical plate (17).

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Arbeitsstuhl mit Rückenlehne (11) ist hinter der Rückenlehne ein Kleiderbügel (19) mit zwei Schulterträgern (21,23) als Bestandteil der Rückenlehne angeordnet. Die Endstücke (25, 27) der Schulterträger (21,23) sind aus weichem Kunststoff und weisen eine Mulde (26) für den Träger einer Tasche auf. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 7/64; A47C 7/40; A47C 7/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 7/40 (2006.01); A47C 7/46 (2006.01); A47C 7/64 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 7/46 (2013.01); A47C 7/40 (2013.01); A47C 7/64 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0970640 A1 20000112

INPADOC legal status


2003-02-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020730

2002-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020319

2000-09-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI NL

2000-03-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991227

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI NL

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI