Global Patent Index - EP 0970650 A1

EP 0970650 A1 2000-01-12 - Applicator for easily disintegrated composition, device comprising said applicator and application method

Title (en)

Applicator for easily disintegrated composition, device comprising said applicator and application method

Title (de)

Auftragselement für schnell lösliche Produkte, damit versehener Behälter und Auftragsverfahren

Title (fr)

Applicateur pour produit délitescent, ensemble comportant un tel applicateur et procédé d'application

Publication

EP 0970650 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99401587 A

Priority

FR 9808543 A

Abstract (en)

The applicator has a recess (2) open onto its face which makes contact with the skin, a reservoir (3) for the product to be applied, located in the recess and designed so the product can make direct contact with the skin wen the applicator is in use, and a porous material (4) able to retain a liquid and supply it directly to the product. The recess is set off-center in the porous material, and the product is in the shape of a tablet which fits into the recess. The porous material can be fitted with a handle or have an opening so it can be used like a glove.

Abstract (fr)

Applicateur pour appliquer sur la peau un produit délitescent comportant : un logement (2 ; 9) débouchant sur une face de l'applicateur destinée à être amenée au contact de la peau pour l'application du produit, une réserve de produit (3) contenue à l'intérieur dudit logement, cette réserve de produit et ledit logement étant conformés de telle sorte que le produit puisse venir directement au contact de la peau lors de l'application, un matériau poreux (2) apte à retenir un liquide et à le restituer directement sur la réserve de produit ainsi que sur la face de l'applicateur amenée au contact de la peau lors de l'application du produit, le produit étant apte à se déliter au contact du liquide libéré par ledit matériau poreux. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47K 7/03; A45D 40/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61M 35/00 (2006.01); A45D 40/00 (2006.01); A45D 40/26 (2006.01); A47K 5/12 (2006.01); B65D 51/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A45D 40/00 (2013.01); A45D 40/26 (2013.01); A45D 2200/1018 (2013.01); A45D 2200/1036 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0970650 A1 20000112; EP 0970650 B1 20030528; CA 2276860 A1 20000103; DE 69908246 D1 20030703; DE 69908246 T2 20040401; ES 2198861 T3 20040201; FR 2780622 A1 20000107; FR 2780622 B1 20010720; JP 2000079167 A 20000321; US 6467981 B1 20021022

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040626

2005-06-25 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050625

2005-04-08 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-02-16 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040625

2005-01-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050101

2004-06-26 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040626

2004-06-25 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040625

2004-05-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040302

2004-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2198861 T3

2003-08-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030805

2003-07-07 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030707

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-07-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69908246 P 20030703

2003-06-25 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030625

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-06-24 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030624

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-06-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030610

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-05-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-05-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-02-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020114

2000-09-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2000-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000619

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI