Global patent index - EP 0970674 A2

EP 0970674 A2 2000-01-12 - A make up removal pad

Title (en)

A make up removal pad

Title (de)

Kissen zum Entfernen von Schminke

Title (fr)

Tampon de démaquillage

Publication

EP 0970674 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99650057 A

Priority

  • IE 980555 A
  • IE 980768 A

Abstract (en)

A makeup removal pad (20) has outer panels (22, 23) of a porous and absorbent fibrous material, preferably cotton. The two outer panels (22, 23) are adhesively sealed together about a peripheral rim (25) of the pad forming a closed envelope or pocket within which is retained an intermediate layer of cotton in-fill material (21) which preferably includes short cotton fibres. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61F 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04H 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04H 1/425 (2013.01); D04H 1/02 (2013.01); D04H 1/4266 (2013.01); D04H 1/4274 (2013.01); D04H 1/4374 (2013.01); D04H 1/44 (2013.01); A45D 2200/1018 (2013.01); A45D 2200/1036 (2013.01); A45D 2200/1063 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0970674 A2 20000112; EP 0970674 A3 20010502

INPADOC legal status

2005-01-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040720

2004-04-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040309

2003-06-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: EDMAK LIMITED

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-01-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20011101

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 61F 13/00 A, 7A 61K 7/48 B

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI