Global Patent Index - EP 0970689 A2

EP 0970689 A2 2000-01-12 - Make-up product with a photochromic pigment and a UV-filter and its uses

Title (en)

Make-up product with a photochromic pigment and a UV-filter and its uses

Title (de)

Schminkprodukt mit einem photochromen Pigment und einem UV-Filter und seine Verwendung

Title (fr)

Produit de maquillage associant un pigment photochrome et un filtre U.V. ses utilisations

Publication

EP 0970689 A2 (FR)

Application

EP 99401502 A

Priority

FR 9808085 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2780275A1] A make-up product comprises two compositions packed separately. One composition (A) contains at least one photochrome coloring agent producing at least one color under UV light and a second (B) contains at least one UV light filter. A make-up product comprises two compositions packed separately. One composition contains at least one photochrome coloring agent producing at least one color under UV light and a second contains at least one UV light filter. Independent claims are also included for: (1) a method for applying the make-up on the human skin, lips and/or superficial body growth (e.g. hair or nails) by applying a layer of (A) and applying a layer of (B) on a part of the first layer; (2) a make-up kit comprising the above described compositions; and (3) a make-up support comprising a first layer of (A) and a second layer of (B) on a part of the first layer.

Abstract (fr)

La présente invention se rapporte à un nouveau produit de maquillage comportant une première composition de colorant ou pigment photochrome destinée à former une couche de base sur un support et une seconde composition contenant un filtre U.V, destinée à former sur la couche de base une couche de surface comportant des motifs décoratifs. Selon la nature de la lumière éclairant le support, il est ainsi possible de voir apparaître ou disparaître lesdits motifs. Ce produit est en particulier destiné au maquillage des ongles, des lèvres, des joues ou des paupières ou encore du corps. L'invention se rapporte aussi à un procédé de maquillage du visage, lèvres ou corps humains.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 7/42; A61K 7/00; A61K 7/043

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 8/00 (2006.01); A61K 8/04 (2006.01); A61K 8/25 (2006.01); A61K 8/27 (2006.01); A61K 8/29 (2006.01); A61K 8/33 (2006.01); A61K 8/35 (2006.01); A61K 8/36 (2006.01); A61K 8/368 (2006.01); A61K 8/37 (2006.01); A61K 8/40 (2006.01); A61K 8/41 (2006.01); A61K 8/49 (2006.01); A61K 8/89 (2006.01); A61K 8/891 (2006.01); A61K 8/97 (2006.01); A61Q 1/00 (2006.01); A61Q 1/02 (2006.01); A61Q 1/04 (2006.01); A61Q 1/10 (2006.01); A61Q 1/12 (2006.01); A61Q 3/02 (2006.01); A61Q 17/04 (2006.01); C08L 83/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61Q 3/02 (2013.01); A61K 8/29 (2013.01); A61Q 17/04 (2013.01); A61K 2800/438 (2013.01); A61K 2800/88 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2780275 A1 19991231; FR 2780275 B1 20000804; BR 9903099 A 20010206; CA 2275963 A1 19991225; DE 69902973 D1 20021024; DE 69902973 T2 20030123; EP 0970689 A2 20000112; EP 0970689 A3 20010131; EP 0970689 B1 20020918; ES 2184393 T3 20030401; JP 2000038329 A 20000208; JP 3556125 B2 20040818; KR 20000006356 A 20000125; US 6080415 A 20000627

INPADOC legal status


2009-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080618

2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080630

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080617

2009-08-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20080618

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080617

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090101

2009-04-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20090228

2009-02-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20080617

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070608

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070613

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070613

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-07-17 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070717

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-06-14 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070614

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060630

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-06-14 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060614

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-06-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060608

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2184393

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-01-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20021223

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69902973

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-10-24

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-09-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-10-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-05-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010419

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010110

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 61K 7/42 A, 7A 61K 7/00 B, 7A 61K 7/04 B

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI